Rhone v. United States of America

Petitioner: Alfonso Bobbie Rhone
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2012cv00718
Filed: April 4, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Magistrate Judge Bade's 27 Report and Recommendation is accepted. Petitioner's 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. A Certificate of Appealability and leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal are denied because Petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/22/2013. (LFIG)
July 16, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk must serve a copy of the Summons, 16 Amended Petition, and this Order upon the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona by certified mail addressed to the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorn ey. The Clerk must also send by certified mail a copy of the Summons, the Amended Petition, and this Order to the United States Attorney General and to Respondent. Respondent Dennis Smith must answer the Amended Petition within 20 days of the date of service. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge James F. Metcalf pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/16/12. (LSP)
May 16, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing without prejudice 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and 9 Supplemental Petition. Petitioner has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file an amended petition. Clerk must enter dismissal without prejudice is Petitioner fails to comply. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/16/12. (LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhone v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: John A Broadwell
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alfonso Bobbie Rhone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?