Stewart v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Thomas Stewart, Jr.
Defendant: Charles L Ryan, Unknown Lockhart, Karen Barcklay-Dodson, Unknown Adu-Tutu, Unknown Bradley, Dennis G Chenail, Unknown Raitter, Unknown Franko and Unknown Curran
Case Number: 2:2012cv00719
Filed: April 4, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Yuma
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2014 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 118 Motion Requesting Docket Sheet. The Clerk of Court shall copy the docket sheet in this case and send it to plaintiff Thomas Stewart, Jr. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 8/7/14.(LSP)
March 25, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - (1) The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Dr. Barcklay'sMotion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 65 ) and Motion to Strike (Doc. 97 ), and Stewart's Motion for Extension of Time to File Cross-Motion for Summary Judgm ent (Doc. 92 ), Motion for Counsel (Doc. 93 ), and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 96 ). (2) Dr. Barcklay's Motion to Strike (Doc. 97 ) is granted. (3) Stewart's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 96 ) is stricken. (4) S tewart's Motion for Extension (Doc. 92 ) and Motion for Counsel (Doc. 93 ) are denied as moot. (5) Dr. Barcklay's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 65 ) is granted, and the Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. (6) The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly and terminate the action. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/25/14. (LAD)
January 18, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 32 Motion to File a Supplemental Amended Complaint to Add New Defendants, is DENIED. That the Clerk of Court is directed to strike Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, doc. 29, from the record as an improper pleading. Plaintiff's 33 Motion to Stay Proceedings, is DENIED. Plaintiff's 34 Motion to Provide Document(s), is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 1/18/13.(DMT)
July 18, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 14 Plaintiff's (Amended)Notice of Motion for Reconsideration re: Dismissing of Defendant(s) and, an Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 7/18/12.(LSP)
July 6, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Thomas Stewart, Jr. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 7/2/12. (DMT)
July 2, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 9 is granted. Plaintiff's May 31,2012 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 10 is denied as moot. Plaintiff's April 4, 2012 Motion for Preliminary Injunction 4 is denied. Plaintiffs May 23, 2012 Motion of Erratum 18 is granted. Counts I and III, and Defendants Ryan, Lockhart, Adu-tutu, Bradley, Chenail, Raitter, Franko, and Curran are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a s ervice packet including the Complaint (Doc. 1), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendant Barcklay-Dodson. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Lawrence O. Anderson for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 7/2/12.(DMT)
May 15, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement from the ADOC's Central Office. If Plaintiff fails to timely comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/15/12.(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Stewart, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Barcklay-Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Adu-Tutu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis G Chenail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Raitter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Franko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?