Nance v. Miser et al

Plaintiff: Keith P Nance
Defendant: Allen Miser, A Vicklund, Mike Linderman and Robert Patton
Case Number: 2:2012cv00734
Filed: April 6, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: David K Duncan (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2016 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this case and all pending matters with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the case. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/12/16. (LSP)
June 18, 2015 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 134 ) and Defendants' Motions to Strike (Docs. 141 , 142 ); Defendants' Motion to Strike (Doc. 141 ) is denied as moot, and Defendants' Amended Motion to Strike (Doc. 142 ) is granted in part and denied in part as forth in this Order; The Clerk of Court is instructed to strike Plaintiff's Notice (Doc. 139 ) and Plaintiff's duplicate attachments (Doc . 138 -1). Defendants Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 134 ) is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this Order. Plaintiff's claims for damages and injunctive relief under RLUIPA, the First Amendment, and the Equal Prot ection Clause regarding a halal diet with meat are dismissed; Defendants Vicklund, Linderman, and Patton are dismissed; Plaintiff's remaining claim is a First Amendment claim for damages against Miser for denial of a shaving waiver for 7 months. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 6/16/15.(KGM)
April 1, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Jury trial set for 7/14/2014 at 9:00 AM, in Courtroom 606, in Phoenix, Arizona; plaintiff pro se and counsel shall appear at 8:30 AM to discuss pretrial matters. The Court grants plaintiff's request for issuance of Writs f or witness Seymour J. Abdullah and plaintiff Keith P. Nance. Defendant having no objection, the Court grants plaintiff's request for issuance of a subpoena as to plaintiff's witness Adam Shabazz. To facilitate issuance of the subpoena as to Adam Shabazz, by no later than 5/2/2014, plaintiff Nance shall notify the court and defendants in writing of Mr. Shabazz's last known address. Plaintiff and defendant shall file proposed jury instructions by 6/10/2014. Plaintiff shall file proposed voir dire questions, not to exceed 54 questions, by no later than 4/11/2014. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/31/2014. (TLB)
March 7, 2014 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 88 Plaintiff pro se Keith P. Nance's Motion for Violation of Rule Eleven, F.R.C.P. On 3/31/2014 at 10:00 AM, the parties shall participate telephonically in a pretrial conference to discuss the lodged "Defendants' Port ion of the Joint Preposed Pretrial Order (Doc. 93 ). Plaintiff shall appear by telephone. Counsel for the defendants shall provide the Court with a telephone number where plaintiff may be contacted and make the necessary arrangements for his appearance by telephone at the hearing. Following the Pretrial Conference, the Court will issue the Final Pretrial Order and set a trial date for this action. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/7/14.(TLB)
January 24, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 90 Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time to Lodge Joint Proposed Pretrial Order. The parteis shall file such order by no later than 1/29/2014. (See attached Order for details). Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/23/2014.(TLB)
January 22, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 87 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 83 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine. Defendants shall have through 1/29/2014 to file a response to said motion. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/22/2014.(TLB)
January 14, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 84 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time Deadline. The Court orders that the parties shall file/lodge their Proposed Joint Pretrial Order with the Court no later than 1/21/2014. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/14/2014.(TLB)
December 13, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Because this action is now ready for trial, ORDERED that plaintiff pro se and attorney(s) who will be responsible for the trial of this lawsuit prepare a proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order and lodge it with the Clerk of the Court no later than 1/13/2014. Any future filings in this case shall be directed to the undersigned. (See attached Order for details). Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 12/13/2013. (TLB)
November 27, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration 71 and Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel 70 , and the Motions are denied. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/27/13.(TLJ)
October 7, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrwan as to 54 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Motions to Strike (Docs. 61 , 62 , 63 ). ORDERED denying 54 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; d enying 61 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike ; denying 62 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike ; denying 63 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. Damage claims under RLUIPA are DISMISSED. The remaining claims are: (a) claims for injunctive relief under the First Amendment and RLUIPA regarding the Halal diet with meat; (b) claim for damages under the First Amendment; (c) equal protection claim for injunctive relief and damages for the Halal diet with meat; and (d) First Amendment damage claim for denial of the shaving waiver for 7 months. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/7/2013.(TLB)
December 20, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Plaintiff's "Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary RestrainingOrder 22 and it is denied. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 12/20/12. (DMT)
November 5, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 21 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 11/2/12.(DMT)
August 23, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court withdraws the reference to the Magistrate Judge as to Plaintiff's motion for clarification, motion to amend, and the First Amended Complaint and as to Defendants' motion for clarification. (Doc. 8-10, 13.) Plaintiff& #039;s motion for clarification and to amend the Complaint are denied. (Doc. 8, 9.) Defendants' 13 motion for clarification is granted to the extent that the First Amended Complaint is screened. Plaintiff's due process allegations are dismissed without prejudice. (Doc. 9.) Defendants Miser, Vicklund, Linderman, and Patton must respond to Plaintiff's religious exercise claims under the First Amendment and the Religious Land Use and Incarcerated Persons Act and his equal prot ection allegations under the Fourteenth Amendment. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the First Amended Complaint (Doc. 9), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants Vicklund and Linder man. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 8/23/12.(DMT)
May 31, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Keith P. Nance. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/30/12. (DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nance v. Miser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith P Nance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Miser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Vicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Linderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?