Neuendorf v. Ryan et al

Petitioner: John Calvin Neuendorf, II
Respondent: Charles L Ryan, Attorney General of the State of Arizona and Terry L Goddard
Case Number: 2:2012cv00755
Filed: April 10, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: David K Duncan (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Petitioner's January 30, 2014 and January 17, 2014 Motions Quo-Statu 30 and 32 . Pursuant to Rule 11(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, the Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 2/21/2014.(ALS)
December 30, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Clerk of Court must strike the September 12, 2013 Amended Petition (Doc. 23 ). Petitioner's September 26, 2013 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. 25 ) is denied as moot. Petitioner's October 17, 2013 Motion to Amend (Doc. 26 ) is denied. Petitioner's December 4, 2013 Motion for Leave to Amend (Doc. 28 ) is denied. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 12/27/2013.(ALS)
September 10, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Petitioner's Amended Petition 16 and this action are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust state court remedies. Petitioner's 7/13/12 Motion to Appoint Counsel 14 is denied as moot. Petitioner's 8/13/12 "Writ of Mandamus" 19 is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment and close the case. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 9/10/12.(TLJ)
June 29, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Petitioner's May 17, 2012 Motion for Leave to Amend (Doc. 10) is denied as moot. Petitioner's First Amended Petition (Doc. 12) is dismissed with leave to amend; Petitioner has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a second amended petition on a court-approved form. The Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice, without further notice to Petitioner, if Petitioner fails to file a second amended petition within 30 days from the date this Order is filed. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/28/12. (LAD)
May 18, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Petitioner's 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Petitioner's 8 Motion to Amend/Correct is granted in part to the extent that Petitioner has 30 days from the date of this Order to file an amended petition and denied with respect to all other relief requested. Petitioner's 9 Motion to Amend/Correct is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court must provide Petitioner with a current, court-approved form for filing a "Petition Under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody." Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/18/12. (LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neuendorf v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Terry L Goddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Calvin Neuendorf, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?