Gamez # 131401 v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Robert Carrasco Gamez, Jr.
Defendant: Unknown Norris and Unknown Valentine
Case Number: 2:2012cv00760
Filed: April 10, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2014 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 112 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. (See attached Order). Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 2/4/2014.(TLB)
July 2, 2013 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 88 ; Defendants'Motion for Summary Judgment 88 is granted; Plaintiff's Motion to Strike 107 is denied; the action is terminate d, and the Clerk must enter judgment accordingly; for the reasons set forth herein, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), an appeal from the judgment in this action would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 7/1/13. (REW)
May 6, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, Magistrate Judge Aspey's Report and Recommendation 33 is adopted; accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed page Limit for Amended Complaint (Proposed) 24 and Plaintiff's request that this court stay his Ruling on Amended Complaint 24 until Defendant Valentine had [sic] been entered into this civil case 25 are denied. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/6/13. (REW)
May 11, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Robert Carrasco Gamez Jr. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/11/12. (REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gamez # 131401 v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Carrasco Gamez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?