Pistor et al v. Garcia et al

Plaintiff: Rahne Pistor, George Abel and Jacob Whitherspoon
Defendant: Farrell Hoosava, Lisa Kaiser, Unknown Parties, Unknown Baxley, Dennis Newman, Gila, County of, Arizona, State of, Carlos Garcia, Reynolds Nejo, Terry Phillips, Tony McDaniel and Gila County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 2:2012cv00786
Filed: April 13, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Gila
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2014 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED denying the county defendants' Motion for Stay 174 . (See attached PDF for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/29/14.(JAMA)
January 13, 2014 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Defendants' cross-motions for summary judgment (Docs. 129 , 132 ). The motions are granted with respect to Defendants Gila County Sheriffs Office and Gila County. The motions are also granted with r espect to plaintiffs' defamation claim. The motions are denied with respect to all other claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED GRANTING plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment with respect to Defendants Baxley, Newman and McDaniel on plaintiffs' § 1983 claims and state law claims of false imprisonment and battery (Doc. 106 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED DENYING plaintiffs' motion to strike (Doc. 150 ). Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/13/2014. (See attached PDF for complete information)(ALS)
June 7, 2013 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING the Tribal Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' State Law Claims (doc. 75 ). Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/6/2013.(KMG)
September 5, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING plaintiffs' motion to strike portions of defendants' reply (doc. 40 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED DENYING defendants Hoosava, Garcia, and Kaiser's motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (doc. 25 ). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/5/2012.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pistor et al v. Garcia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farrell Hoosava
Represented By: Glenn M Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Kaiser
Represented By: Glenn M Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Baxley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gila, County of
Represented By: Georgia A Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Represented By: Jonathan F Weisbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Garcia
Represented By: Glenn M Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynolds Nejo
Represented By: Jonathan F Weisbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Phillips
Represented By: Jonathan F Weisbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony McDaniel
Represented By: Jonathan F Weisbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gila County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Georgia A Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rahne Pistor
Represented By: Robert A Nersesian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Abel
Represented By: Robert A Nersesian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Whitherspoon
Represented By: Robert A Nersesian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?