Brandon et al v. Liddy et al

Plaintiff: Maria Brandon and Jerry Brandon
Defendant: Tom Liddy, Stacy Liddy, Rocky Armfield, Chris Armfield, Maricopa, County of and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2012cv00788
Filed: April 13, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David K Duncan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2014 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 211 motion for attorney's fees and costs and awarding fees to plaintiff in the amount of $302,175.28. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/10/2014.(LMR)
September 2, 2014 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 217 motion for judgment as a matter of law or alternatively for a new trial. See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/2/2014.(LMR)
October 24, 2013 126 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSOLIDATION ORDER - LEAD CASE granting 121 Brandon's Motion to Consolidate lead case CV-12-788-PHX with member case CV-13-1148-PHX. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying 101 Brandon's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; 106 County's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 115 County's Motion to Strike and denying 118 Brandon's Motion for leave to file a Converting Statement. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/23/13. (LSP)
July 11, 2013 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 91 Motion for Extension of the Discovery Deadline FURTHER ORDERED granting 92 Motion for In Camera Inspection, denying 92 Motion to Set Aside Order Compelling Disclosure FURTHER ORDERED denying 93 Motion to Seal Exhibit B. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 7/11/13.(MAP)
September 14, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting in part Rocky and Chris Armfield, Maricopay County, and Sandi and Paul Wilson's 34 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Counts II, III, V and VIII are dismissed against these defendants. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/13/12.(REW)
June 11, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying on grounds of mootness 11 Armfields and Maricopa County's Motion to Strike allegations in plaintiff's [sic] pleadings; denying on grounds of mootness 14 Liddys' Motion to Strike; denying on grounds of mootness 15 Liddys' Motion to Dismiss; denying on grounds of mootness 16 Armfields and Maricopa County's Motion to Amend their motion to dismiss; and denying on grounds of mootness 17 Armfields and Maricopa County's Amended Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/8/12.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandon et al v. Liddy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Brandon
Represented By: Larry J Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Brandon
Represented By: Larry J Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Liddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Liddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Armfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Armfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?