Coronel v. GEICO Insurance Agency Incorporated

Plaintiff: Katherine Coronel
Defendant: GEICO Insurance Agency Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2012cv00795
Filed: April 16, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2015 255 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER granting in part and denying in part 222 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 252 Motion to Seal: GEICO's motion for summary judgment regarding breach of contract and punitive damages is granted. GEICO's motion for summary judgment regarding insurance bad faith is denied. GEICO's motion to seal is granted. GEICO shall file on the public record, by 10/16/2015, a redacted version of Exhibit 18. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/7/2015 at 2:00 p.m. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order is due 11/20/2015. Motions in limine are due 10/30/2015; responses are due 11/13/2015. See order for additional details. (Amending Doc. 253 ). Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/24/2015. (LMR)
August 1, 2013 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 120 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, denying 126 Defendant's motion for the court to reconsider its position on Plaintiff's bad faith claim. See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 7/31/2013.(LMR)
June 27, 2013 116 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER denying, in part, Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment as to her uninsured motorist claim and granting, in part, Plaintiff's motion for patial summary judgment as to her bad faith claim re 59 . ORDER denying 67 Defendant's motion for Rule 56(d) Relief. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 6/26/13.(TLJ)
November 8, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the Court will deny Plaintiffs' request to find a waiver of privileged communications re 26 and 27 (please see attached order for complete information). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/8/12. (TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coronel v. GEICO Insurance Agency Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Insurance Agency Incorporated
Represented By: Sanford Keith Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Coronel
Represented By: David M Bell
Represented By: Brian Lee Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?