Anderson et al v. Chandler et al

Plaintiff: Anthony D Anderson and Gay-Dee Anderson
Defendant: Unknown MacDonald, Allstate Insurance Company, Unknown Parties, John D Chandler, Unknown Chandler and Jeffrey MacDonald
Case Number: 2:2012cv00813
Filed: April 18, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to the parties' 114 Stipulation of Dismissal: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE any and all claims with all parties to bear their respective costs and attorney's fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED VACATING the statu s hearing set for Monday, March 10, 2014 at 2:30 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED DENYING as moot Plaintiff Anderson's motion for partial summary judgment (Doc. 76 ) and Defendant MacDonald's cross-motion for summary judgment (Doc. 81 ). Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/4/2014. (KMG)
July 25, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part John and Jane Doe Chandler's and Jeffery and Jane Doe MacDonald's Motion to Dismiss Counts 3, 4, 5, 6, and 7 for Failure to State a Claim considered as a motion for judgment on the pleadings (Doc. 39 .) FURTHER ORDERED entering judgment in favor of John and Jane Doe Chandler and Jeffery and Jane Doe MacDonald on Count Three- Fraud and Count Four- Fraudulent Concealment. FURTHER ORDERED denying John and Jane Doe Chandler's and Jeffery and Jane Doe MacDonald's Motion to Dismiss as to Count Five- Fraudulent Transfer, Count Six- Conspiracy, and Count Seven- Punitive Damages. FURTHER ORDERED denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike (Doc. 50 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Plaintiff's Motion for Rule 56(d) Relief as moot. (Doc. 50.) Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 7/24/2013.(KMG)
September 21, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the Chandler Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction 6 is denied without prejudice; the Motion to Strike filed by the Plaintiffs 13 is denied; the Motion for Rule 56(d) Relief filed by the Plaintiffs 13 is denied as moot; the Motion for an Evidentiary Hearing filed by the Chandler Defendants 14 is denied. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/21/12.(REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. Chandler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown MacDonald
Represented By: James David Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric Edward Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D Chandler
Represented By: James David Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Chandler
Represented By: James David Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey MacDonald
Represented By: James David Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony D Anderson
Represented By: Stephen E Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gay-Dee Anderson
Represented By: Stephen E Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?