September 6, 2017 |
Filing
462
ORDER AND OPINION - Plaintiffs' motion at docket 439 is GRANTED. The declaration of Robert Crandall filed at docket 430 -1, and all references to the declaration, are hereby stricken. IntelliQuick is ordered to pay the Plaintiffs' reasonable expenses, including attorney's fees, incurred in bringing this motion. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 9/5/17.(LAD)
|
July 13, 2017 |
Filing
425
ORDER denying 419 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline and denying as moot 424 Motion to Expedite; denying as moot 424 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 7/13/17. (JWS)
|
March 23, 2015 |
Filing
343
ORDER the 304 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs' request for a determination that they are employees for purposes of the FLSA and the Arizona Wage Act is GRANTED, and plaintiffs' request for partial summary judgment holding that defendants Transportation Authority, Inc., Keith Spizzirri, and Bob Lorgeree are joint employers under the FLSA is DENIED. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 3/23/2015. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)
|
June 9, 2014 |
Filing
287
ORDER granting 200 Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Defendants Intelliquick Delivery, Inc. and the marital community of Keith Spizzeri are jointly liable to pay Plaintiffs the sum of $13,253.63. They shall tender payment to Plaintiffs' counsel, who shall be responsible for allocating it among the several plaintiffs. Payment shall be made in the form of a check payable to Plaintiffs' counsel within 21 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 6/9/14.(JWS)
|
December 8, 2013 |
Filing
185
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 140 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiffs may NOT add KMS or MT I as defendants, but may add ME as a defendant. Plaintiffs may add the other text changes contained in the second amended complaint lodged at docket 140-1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED: Plaintiffs shall promptly file a second amended complaint that complies with this order and promptly perfect service on ME. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 12/6/13.(JWS)
|
December 3, 2013 |
Filing
175
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 137 Motion to Compel. Within 28 days Defendants shall fully respond to the outstanding discovery requests pertaining to written contracts and related written communications (including electronic communica tions) IntelliQuick had with customers for whom IntelliQuick provided pick-up, delivery, courier or other transportation services which could be provided by freight drivers, route drivers or on-demand drivers during the period between April 19, 2009, and June 26, 2013. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a motion seeking to recover a portion of their reasonable expenses on or before December 13, 2013, to which Defendants shall respond on or before December 22, 2013. No reply may be filed unless requested by the court. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 12/3/13.(JWS)
|
December 11, 2012 |
Filing
91
ORDER granting 62 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 12/11/12.(JWS)
|
July 31, 2012 |
Filing
59
ORDER re 32 Motion to Certify Class. 1) It is ORDERED conditionally certifying a class that includes All current and former drivers or couriers, who made pick-ups or deliveries for or on behalf of IntelliQuick Deliveries, Inc. as a Freight Driver , Route Driver, or On-Demand Driver within the State of Arizona and who were or are classified or paid as independent contractors or not classified or paid as employees at any time on or after April 9, 2009. 2) Defendants shall provide to plaintiffs ' counsel the last known contact information for potential class members. 3) Plaintiffs' proposed notice is approved provided the opt-in period is amended to sixty days. 4) Because contact information for current employees who are potential class members will be provided to plaintiffs, the court declines to require that IntelliQuick post the notice and consent forms at its business locations. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 7/31/12.(JWS)
|