Curtis v. Ryan et al

Petitioner: Kurzie Lee Curtis
Respondent: Charles L Ryan and Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Case Number: 2:2012cv00838
Filed: April 23, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Mohave
Referring Judge: David K Duncan (PS)
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING AND ACCEPTING 34 Magistrate Judge Duncan's Report and Recommendation. Petitioner's Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 12 ) is DISMISSED and DENIED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED DENYING a Certificate of Appealability.The Clerk shall close this case. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 7/8/13. (LSP)
March 25, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Petitioner's 29 and 32 Motions. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 3/25/2013.(LFIG)
February 12, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Petitioner's Motion for Release Pending Appeal and Motion to Amend the Motion for Release Pending Appeal. Petitioner's Motion for Release Pending Appeal and Motion to Amend the Motion for Release Pending Appeal 24 and 26 are denied. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 2/12/13.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kurzie Lee Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?