Alliance Labs LLC v. Stratus Pharmaceuticals Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Alliance Labs LLC
Defendant: Stratus Pharmaceuticals Incorporated and Sonar Products Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2012cv00927
Filed: May 2, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2013 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 172 Sealed Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting in part and denying in part 172 Sealed Motion for Permanent Injunction; denying 178 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 183 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 10/7/13.(JWS)
July 1, 2013 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to plaintiffs' 127 Motion for Attorney Fees. ORDERED that defendant shall pay plaintiffs the sum of $7,220.00 within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 7/1/2013.(LFIG)
January 24, 2013 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that defendant's 35 Motion for More Definite Statement is DENIED. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 1/23/2013.(LFIG)
August 24, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Sonar's 12 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction is GRANTED. Sonar is DISMISSED from this action. Stratus' 16 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction is DENIED. Stratus' alternative motion to dismiss for improper venue or to transfer to an alternative venue for the convenience of the witnesses and the parties is DENIED. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 8/24/2012.(LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alliance Labs LLC v. Stratus Pharmaceuticals Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alliance Labs LLC
Represented By: Saul H Perloff
Represented By: Katharyn A Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stratus Pharmaceuticals Incorporated
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Motolenich-Salas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonar Products Incorporated
Represented By: Mark E Wiemelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?