Hill # 129417 v. Creio et al

Petitioner: Talmadge Laroy Hill
Respondent: Ron Creio and Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Case Number: 2:2012cv00985
Filed: May 10, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Petitioner's Motion to Re Open Case (Doc. 28 ), construed as a motion for reconsideration, is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that to the extent that a certificate of appealability is necessary, no certificate of appealability shall issue because reasonable jurists would not find the Court's procedural ruling debatable. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall amend the docket to show that the petitioners mailing address is: Talmadge L. Hill, No. 129417, Arizona State Prison-Eyman Complex, Rynning Unit, P.O. Box 3100, Florence, AZ 85132. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 11/14/2016. (REK)
August 31, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Petitioner's Habeas Corpus Amendment (Doc. 25 ), construed as a motion for reconsideration, is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that to the extent that a certificate of appealability is necessary, no certificate of appealability shall issue because reasonable jurists would not find the Court's procedural ruling debatable;Petitioner's Request for Copy of Petition (Doc. 26 ) is granted and that the Clerk of the Court shall mail the petitioner a copy of his Habeas Corpus Amendment (Doc. 25 ). Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 8/30/2016. (REK)
October 2, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 16 . ORDER that petitioner's Petition Under 28:2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied and that this action is dismissed. ORDER that no certificate of appealability shall issue and that the petitioner is denied leave to appeal in forma pauperis. ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 10/1/13. (TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill # 129417 v. Creio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Talmadge Laroy Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ron Creio
Represented By: Liza-Jane Capatos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Represented By: Liza-Jane Capatos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?