Riendeau et al v. Apache Carson Partners LP et al

Plaintiff: Bonnie Riendeau and Walter Olson
Defendant: Apache Carson Partners LP, Grant Road Self Storage LP, Stadium Properties LLC, Administaff Companies Incorporated, Robert C Mister, Unknown Mister, John C Thomson, Unknown Thomson and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2012cv00988
Filed: May 10, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part plaintiffs' motion for attorney's fees (Doc. 76 ) and awarding fees and costs in the amount of $103,606.00. As amended, IT IS ORDERED GRANTING the joint motion to approve settlement (Doc. 76 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED DISMISSING this action with prejudice, with each party to bear its fees and costs except as provided in this order. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/19/13. (LSP)
December 9, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED DENYING the parties' joint motion seeking to stay pending Rule 16 deadlines 76 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit, on or before December 12, 2013, a memorandum, not exceeding 5 pages in length, and providing support for the reasonableness of the requested fee. (See attached PDF for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/9/13. (JAMA)
June 3, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 plaintiffs' Motion for conditional FLSA class certification. See PDF document for details. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/31/13.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riendeau et al v. Apache Carson Partners LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Riendeau
Represented By: Michael Rhodes Pruitt
Represented By: Nathaniel James Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Olson
Represented By: Michael Rhodes Pruitt
Represented By: Nathaniel James Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apache Carson Partners LP
Represented By: Mark S Sifferman
Represented By: Karen L Karr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Road Self Storage LP
Represented By: Mark S Sifferman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stadium Properties LLC
Represented By: Karen L Karr
Represented By: Mark S Sifferman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administaff Companies Incorporated
Represented By: Shayna Helene Balch
Represented By: Pavneet Singh Uppal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C Mister
Represented By: Mark S Sifferman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Mister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C Thomson
Represented By: Mark S Sifferman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?