Custom Homes By Via LLC v. Bank of Oklahoma NA et al

Plaintiff: Custom Homes By Via LLC
Defendant: Bank of Oklahoma NA, Bank of Arizona and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2012cv01017
Filed: May 15, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2014 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 134 Motion for Attorney Fees and Pre-Judgment Interest and awarding Plaintiff $304,739.00. ORDERED granting the 154 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/18/2014.(LFIG)
June 6, 2014 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 156 plaintiff's motion for Order Fixing Attorney's Fees and AWARDING plaintiff pretrial fees in the amount of $22,387.50. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/4/14.(LSP)
December 23, 2013 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court finds in favor of Custom and against the Bank of Oklahoma in the amount of $2,404,193.58. The clerk shall enter final judgment in favor of plaintiffs in this amount. ORDERED denying all pending motions for directed verdict. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/23/2013.(LFIG)
November 18, 2013 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED GRANTING the parties' joint Motion to try this case to the court without a jury 101 . Trial will proceed as scheduled beginning November 19th, 2014 at 9:00 AM to the court without a jury. (See attached order for details). Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/18/13. (JAMA)
November 7, 2013 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED denying 90 the Bank's Motion for Reconsideration. (See attached PDF for details). Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/7/13.(JAMA)
October 28, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 51 Motion for Partial Summary. Plaintiff is granted summary judgment on Count 1 for failure to fund the May 27, 2008 draw request. Summary Judgment on Count 7 (wrongful foreclosure) is denied. ORDERED granting in part and denying in part the Bank's 49 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Bank's motion on Counts 3, 4, 5, 7 and plaintiff's claim for punitive damages is granted. Its motion on counts 1 and 2 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying defendant's 59 Motion to Strike. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/25/2013. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Custom Homes By Via LLC v. Bank of Oklahoma NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Oklahoma NA
Represented By: Lorena C Van Assche
Represented By: Kevin Michael Judiscak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Arizona
Represented By: Kevin Michael Judiscak
Represented By: Lorena C Van Assche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Custom Homes By Via LLC
Represented By: Shaye David Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?