Arizona State Legislature v. Arizona Independent Redistricting Commission et al

Plaintiff: Arizona State Legislature
Defendant: Jose M Herrera, Scott D Freeman, Richard Stertz, Ken Bennett, Arizona Independent Redistricting Commission, Colleen Mathis and Linda C McNulty
Case Number: 2:2012cv01211
Filed: June 7, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 16 is granted; Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction for Lack of Standing 43 is denied; Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 33 is denied as moot. Circuit Judge Mary M. Schroeder concurs with this Order. District Paul G. Rosenblatt concurrs in part and dissents in part. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/21/14.(REW)
February 5, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the Motion to Intervene by Maricopa County 49 is summarily denied as untimely. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 2/5/14.(REW)
August 14, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 23 Rule 1 Motion is denied as moot. ORDERED that the AIRC Defendants' 9 Motion for Reconsideration is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall notify the Honorable Alex Kozinski, Chief Judge of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, of this Order so that he may designate the other two judges of the three-judge court as required by 28 U.S.C. § 2284(b)(1). Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 8/12/2013.(LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arizona State Legislature v. Arizona Independent Redistricting Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose M Herrera
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Kanefield
Represented By: Brunn Wall Roysden, III
Represented By: Kristin Louise Windtberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott D Freeman
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Kanefield
Represented By: Brunn Wall Roysden, III
Represented By: Kristin Louise Windtberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Stertz
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Kanefield
Represented By: Brunn Wall Roysden, III
Represented By: Kristin Louise Windtberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Independent Redistricting Commission
Represented By: Kristin Louise Windtberg
Represented By: Brunn Wall Roysden, III
Represented By: Mary Ruth OGrady
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Kanefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Mathis
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Kanefield
Represented By: Brunn Wall Roysden, III
Represented By: Kristin Louise Windtberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda C McNulty
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Kanefield
Represented By: Brunn Wall Roysden, III
Represented By: Kristin Louise Windtberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona State Legislature
Represented By: Gregory G Jernigan
Represented By: Peter Andrew Gentala
Represented By: Joshua William Carden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?