Finney et al v. First Tennessee Bank et al

Plaintiff: Mark A Finney and Conlon Group Arizona LLC
Defendant: First Tennessee Bank, Nationstar Mortgage LLC and Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 2:2012cv01249
Filed: June 11, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' oral Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, (Doc. 57 ), is denied as moot. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 03-03-16.(GAR)
March 31, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. See attached Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/31/2015.(TLB)
May 6, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/6/13. (LAD)
July 30, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint within 21 days from the date of this order; if Plaintiffs fail to file an amended complaint within this deadline, the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment dismissing this case with prejudice. Denying as moot 12 Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/30/12.(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finney et al v. First Tennessee Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A Finney
Represented By: Jerry L Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conlon Group Arizona LLC
Represented By: Jerry L Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Tennessee Bank
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?