Beltran-Ojeda v. Unknown Parties et al

Plaintiff: Saul Beltran-Ojeda
Defendant: Unknown Parties and Joseph M Arpaio
Case Number: 2:2012cv01287
Filed: June 15, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Plaintiff's 35 Motion for Reconsideration and the motion is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/18/2014.(LFIG)
November 18, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' 24 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' 24 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part as follows: (a) the Motion is granted as to Count I, and Co unt I is dismissed for failure to exhaust administrative remedies; and (b) the Motion is denied as to Count II. Arpaio is dismissed as a Defendant. The remaining claim is Count II against Dr. Friedman. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/18/2013. (LFIG)
July 17, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' 16 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' 16 Motion to Dismiss is denied without prejudice. Within 10 days from the date of this Order, Defendants must file either an Answer or new motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/17/2013.(LFIG)
January 18, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet): ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims in Count Two regarding medical testing and medical appointments, as well as his claims against Defendant Arpaio in Count Two, are dismissed without prejudice. Defendant Doe is dismissed wi thout prejudice. Defendant Arpaio must answer Count One of the Second Amended Complaint and Defendant Friedman must answer Plaintiff's hepatitis C claims in Count Two. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the 10 Second Amended Complaint, this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants Arpaio and Friedman. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Mark E. Aspey for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/18/2013. (LFIG)
October 31, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the First Amended Complaint 7 is dismissed for failure to state a claim; Plaintiff has 30 days to file a second amended complaint in compliance with this Order; if Plaintiff fails to comply with this order, the Clerk must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/30/12. (REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beltran-Ojeda v. Unknown Parties et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saul Beltran-Ojeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?