Stoller, et al v. Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Stoller
Defendant: Unknown Parties, Neal B Thomas, John Hall & Associates, Reconstruct Company NA, Bryan Cave LLP, Steven R Smith, Michael Werich, Those Callaways PC, Joann Callaway, Joseph Callaway, Kelly Callaway, Thomas, Thomas & Markson PC, Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, Robert P Kelly, Gerald L Hassell, Thomas P Gibbons, Carl Krasik, Bank of America, Walter E Massey, Joe Price, Brian T Moynihan, Countrywide Bank NA, Joseph M Arpaio, Betty L Sterrett, Law Firm of Miles, Bauer, Bergstrom & Winters LLP, Leonard Street, Donna Street and Stephen E Sterrett
Case Number: 2:2012cv01307
Filed: June 18, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 45 Motion to Strike is denied. The Complaint and this action are dismissed with prejudice. Certain Defendants' 43 Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot. Plaintiff's 35 Cross-Motion for Sanctions and 50 M otion to Order Service are denied. Certain Defendants' 15 Motion for Sanctions is granted in part and denied in part. Leo Stoller, Christopher Stoller and Aaron Penna on behalf of Leo Stoller or Christopher Stoller, are enjoined from filing any further actions, motions, or other proceedings in Federal Court in Arizona in connection with any loan made by a Defendant in this case that was secured by a deed of trust on Properties 1-4, or foreclosures thereon, absent prefiling review and permission from this Court. A copy of this Order must be sent by the Clerk of the Court to the judges of the United States District Court for the District of Arizona. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/24/2013. (LFIG)
January 15, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that certain Defendants' 37 Motion to File Excess Pages in their reply to Plaintiff's response to their Motion for Sanctions is granted. Plaintiff's 39 Motion for an Extension of Time in which to file his reply to certain Defendants' response to his cross-motion for sanctions is granted to the extent that his 41 Reply, is deemed timely. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/15/2013.(LFIG)
November 20, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the caption for all future filings in this case must conform to the caption on this Order and the docket must be modified to reflect that Leo Stoller, as agent of Christopher Stoller, is the Plaintiff. ORDERED Plaintiff's 2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is granted and Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee. Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Leave to File his Response by Mail is denied. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/20/2012.(LFIG)
October 22, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 5 Motion for Disqualification is denied. Defendants' 17 Motion to Expedite Consideration is granted. Defendants' 16 Motion Seeking an Order requiring Leo Stoller to respond to the 15 Motion for Sanctions is granted. Within 30 days of the filing date of the October 17, 2012 Order, Leo Stoller must file a response to Defendants' motion for sanctions, as supplemented. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/22/2012.(LFIG)
October 17, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that within 30 days of the filing date of this Order, Plaintiff must show cause why this action should not be dismissed based on Plaintiff's lack of legal capacity to bring this action. Plaintiff's 3 MOTION for Injunctive Relief is denied. Defendants' 12 MOTION to Exceed Page Limit is granted. Plaintiff Christopher Stoller and his attorney, Aaron Penna, must file a response to Defendants' motion for sanctions no later than 30 days from the filing date of this Order. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/17/2012. (LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoller, et al v. Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neal B Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hall & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reconstruct Company NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Cave LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven R Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Werich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Those Callaways PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joann Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas, Thomas & Markson PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert P Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald L Hassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas P Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Krasik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter E Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian T Moynihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty L Sterrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Firm of Miles, Bauer, Bergstrom & Winters LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen E Sterrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Stoller
Represented By: Aaron Penna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?