Franchise Holding II LLC v. Huntington Restaurants Group Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Franchise Holding II LLC
Defendant: Huntington Restaurants Group Incorporated, Golden Management Incorporated, Richard Beattie and Michelle Beattie
Case Number: 2:2012cv01363
Filed: June 25, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David K Duncan
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 89 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/24/2014.(DGC, nvo)
January 8, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 72 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and granting 74 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff will be awarded damages in the amount of $12,800,000, with prejudgment interest at ten percent per annum. Plaintiff shall lodge a proposed form of judgment with the Court on or before January 15, 2014. See PDF document for details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/8/14.(LSP)
February 13, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before 2/20/2013. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/13/2013.(NVO)
November 1, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/1/2012.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franchise Holding II LLC v. Huntington Restaurants Group Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franchise Holding II LLC
Represented By: Sarah Kate Langenhuizen
Represented By: Michael Lee Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Restaurants Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Management Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Beattie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Beattie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?