Nimer v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Alan Troy Nimer
Defendant: Unknown Penn, Unknown Taylor, Unknown Corona, Charles L Ryan, Unknown Parties, Unknown Kane, Unknown Brown and Unknown Matt
Case Number: 2:2012cv01435
Filed: July 2, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 71 Plaintiff's Response to Order and Motion for Good Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 5/6/2014.(ALS)
April 14, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time for Deadlines Set bythe Court 60 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Motion is granted in that the deadline to bring discovery disputes to the Court's attention is extended by sixty days to May 3, 2014. The other requested extensions are denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 4/14/2014.(ALS)
February 4, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 39 Motion for Leave to Amend. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 2/4/14. (LAD)
December 4, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Obtain Defendants Address (Doc. 33 ) and Plaintiffs Motion to Obtain First Amended Complaint (Doc. 34 ) are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before Friday, December 13, 2013, Plaintiff shall show cause in writing why Defendant Gabowski should not be dismissed without prejudice from this action for failure to serve pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m) and LRCiv. 16.2(b)(2)(B)(i). (See attached Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 12/4/2013.(TLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nimer v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Penn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Corona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Matt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Troy Nimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?