Henderson v. Arpaio

Plaintiff: Tommie L Henderson, Jr.
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Case Number: 2:2012cv01438
Filed: July 3, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; the Second Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk must enter judgment of dismissal accordingly. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/22/13.(LSP)
March 12, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet): ORDERED that Count Two is dismissed without prejudice. Defendant Arpaio must answer Count One of the Second Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the 14 Second Amended Complai nt, this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendant Arpaio. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge James F. Metcalf for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/12/2013. (LFIG)
November 26, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 10 Motion for a Determination on the Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is denied as moot. The 12 First Amended Complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a second amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The Clerk must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/26/2012. (LFIG)
October 10, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Plaintiff's Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying 7 Plaintiff's August 7, 2012 Motion. The complaint is dismissed with 30 days leave to amend. Clerk must enter dismissal with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) if plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/10/12.(LSP)
July 30, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 2 Plaintiff's Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Clerk must enter dismissal without prejudice if plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/30/12.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommie L Henderson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?