Isaacson et al v. Horne et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Paul A Isaacson, William Clewell and Hugh Miller
Defendant: Lisa Wynn, Thomas C Horne, William Montgomery, Barbara Lawall and Arizona Medical Board
Case Number: 2:2012cv01501
Filed: July 12, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2012 53 Ninth Circuit Case Number 12-16670 for 52 Notice of Appeal. (KMG)
July 30, 2012 52 *NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit, re 50 Order, 51 Judgment by Paul A Isaacson, William Clewell, and Hugh Miller. Filing fee received: $ 455.00, receipt number 0970-7060520. (Brown, David) *Modified as to filers and document relationship on 7/30/2012 (KMG).
July 30, 2012 51 JUDGMENT that pursuant to the Courts order filed July 30, 2012, judgment is entered in favor of defendants and against plaintiffs. Plaintiffs to take nothing, and complaint and action are dismissed. (MAP)
July 30, 2012 50 Featured Case ORDER denying 25 Motion to Dismiss Case FURTHER ORDERED denying 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' request for a Permanent Injunction is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' request for a declaratory judgment is denied. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs on the declaratory judgment action. FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot 42 Motion to Dismiss Barbara LaWall. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/30/12. (MAP)
July 26, 2012 49 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Paul A Isaacson for proceedings held on JULY 25, 2012 before Judge JAMES A. TEILBORG.. (Schulman, Janie)
July 26, 2012 48 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Hearing re: Motion for Preliminary Injunction/TRO Proceedings held on 7/25/2012, before Judge James A. Teilborg. Court Reporter David C. German. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/16/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2012. (VAR)
July 25, 2012 47 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by William Montgomery for proceedings held on 7/25/2012 before Judge James A. Teilborg.. (Irish, Douglas)
July 25, 2012 46 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge James A Teilborg on 7/25/2012. Motion Hearing held re: 25 Motion to Dismiss, 42 Motion to Dismiss Party, and 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Oral argument. IT IS ORDERED taking the motions under advisement. (Court Reporter David German.)(TLB)
July 24, 2012 45 *AMENDED DOCUMENT re 31 Notice of Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by William Montgomery (Corrected). (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Findings of Fact and Conclusion of Law)(Mangum, J) *Modified to correct event type on 7/24/2012 (LSP).
July 24, 2012 44 Featured Case ORDER - The Hearing set for 7/25/2012 at 8:30 a.m. will be held in Courtoom 200 (Special Proceedings Courtroom, Second Floor). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/24/12. (TLB)
July 24, 2012 43 Letter from Body of Christ Ministry. (LSP)
July 23, 2012 42 MOTION to Dismiss Party Barbara LaWall as Defendant by William Montgomery. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Mangum, J)
July 23, 2012 41 SUPPLEMENT Defendant William G. Montgomery's Supplemental Citations Re: Facial Attacks on a Statute by Defendant William Montgomery. (Comus, Louis)
July 23, 2012 40 NOTICE re of Service of Court's Order Setting Preliminary Injunction Hearing by William Clewell, Paul A Isaacson, Hugh Miller re 12 Order, Set Motion Hearing,, . (LaVoy, Christopher)
July 23, 2012 39 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Suit; Complaint; Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Consideration, or, in the Alternative, for a Temporary Restraining Order, with Accompanying Declarations, Memorandum of Law and Proposed Form of Order; Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Consideration, or, in the Alternative, for a Temporary Restraining Order served on William Montgomery on 07/16/12, filed by William Clewell, Paul A Isaacson, Hugh Miller. (LaVoy, Christopher)
July 23, 2012 38 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Suit; Complaint; Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Consideration, or, in the Alternative, for a Temporary Restraining Order, with Accompanying Declarations, Memorandum of Law and Proposed Form of Order; Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Consideration, or, in the Alternative, for a Temporary Restraining Order served on Tom Horne on 07/16/2012, filed by William Clewell, Paul A Isaacson, Hugh Miller. (LaVoy, Christopher)
July 23, 2012 37 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Suit; Complaint; Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Consideration, or, in the Alternative, for a Temporary Restraining Order, with Accompanying Declarations, Memorandum of Law and Proposed Form of Order; Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Consideration, or, in the Alternative, for a Temporary Restraining Order served on Barbara LaWall, Pima County Attorney on 07/16/2012, filed by William Clewell, Paul A Isaacson, Hugh Miller. (LaVoy, Christopher)
July 23, 2012 36 RESPONSE to Motion re 25 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by William Clewell, Paul A Isaacson, Hugh Miller. (LaVoy, Christopher)
July 23, 2012 35 Additional Attachments to Main Document re 34 Reply to Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs William Clewell, Paul A Isaacson, Hugh Miller. (LaVoy, Christopher)
July 23, 2012 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by William Clewell, Paul A Isaacson, Hugh Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(LaVoy, Christopher)
July 20, 2012 33 NOTICE re Filing of State Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Arizona Medical Board, Thomas C Horne, Lisa Wynn . (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Hiller, Evan)
July 20, 2012 32 NOTICE re Filing of Pima County Attorney's Proposed Statement of Facts and Conlusions of Law by Barbara Lawall . (Attachments: # 1 Pima County Attorney's Proposed Statement of Facts and Conlusions of Law)(Perrera, Paula)
July 20, 2012 31 AMENDED by (Doc. 45). NOTICE re Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by William Montgomery . (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Comus, Louis) Modified on 7/24/2012 (LSP).
July 20, 2012 30 NOTICE re Notice of Filing by William Clewell, Paul A Isaacson, Hugh Miller . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(LaVoy, Christopher)
July 20, 2012 29 STATEMENT of Joint Pre-Hearing Statement by Defendants Arizona Medical Board, Thomas C Horne, Barbara Lawall, William Montgomery, Lisa Wynn, Plaintiffs William Clewell, Paul A Isaacson, Hugh Miller. (LaVoy, Christopher)
July 20, 2012 28 Featured Case ORDER denying Defendant Montgomery's 20 Motion for Appointment of Attorney to Represent the Interest of the Unborn; however, to the extent that any third-party believes that the Court would benefit from the briefing of a particular issue or issues (whether it be on behalf of the unborn or the parents), such third-party may file an appropriate motion to file amicus curiae briefing and also file a lodged version of such briefing with that motion. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/20/12. (REW)
July 19, 2012 27 RESPONSE to Motion re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or Temporary Restraining Order filed by William Montgomery. (Comus, Louis)
July 19, 2012 26 RESPONSE to Motion re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arizona Medical Board, Thomas C Horne, Lisa Wynn. (Hiller, Evan)
July 19, 2012 25 MOTION to Dismiss Case by William Montgomery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1 of 16, # 2 Exhibit Part 2 of 16, # 3 Exhibit Part 3 of 16, # 4 Exhibit Part 4 of 16, # 5 Exhibit Part 5 of 16, # 6 Exhibit Part 6 of 16, # 7 Exhibit Part 7 of 16, # 8 Exhibit Part 8 of 16, # 9 Exhibit Part 9 of 16, # 10 Exhibit Part 10 of 16, # 11 Exhibit Part 11 of 16, # 12 Exhibit Part 12 of 16, # 13 Exhibit Part 13 of 16, # 14 Exhibit Part 14 of 16, # 15 Exhibit Part 15 of 16, # 16 Exhibit Part 16 of 16)(Comus, Louis)
July 19, 2012 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Franklin Hiller on behalf of Arizona Medical Board, Thomas C Horne, Lisa Wynn. (Hiller, Evan)
July 19, 2012 23 RESPONSE to Motion re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Barbara Lawall. (Perrera, Paula)
July 19, 2012 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula J Perrera on behalf of Barbara Lawall. (Perrera, Paula)
July 19, 2012 21 Additional Attachments to Main Document re 20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to Represent the Interest of the Unborn Proposed Order by Defendant William Montgomery. (Comus, Louis)
July 19, 2012 20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to Represent the Interest of the Unborn by William Montgomery. (Comus, Louis)
July 17, 2012 NOTICE of request for e-notices by Amy J. Gittler. (Gittler, Amy)
July 13, 2012 19 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 13, 2012 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX124051 as to Nancy R Thomas. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 13, 2012 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Nancy R Thomas on behalf of Paul A Isaacson. (BAS)
July 13, 2012 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX124047 as to Susan Talcott Camp. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 13, 2012 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Susan Talcott Camp on behalf of William Clewell. (BAS)
July 13, 2012 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX124048 as to David Brown. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 13, 2012 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney David Brown on behalf of Paul A Isaacson. (BAS)
July 13, 2012 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX124049 as to Janet Crepps. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 13, 2012 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Janet Crepps on behalf of Paul A Isaacson. (BAS)
July 13, 2012 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX124050 as to Janie F Schulman. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 13, 2012 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Janie F Schulman on behalf of Paul A Isaacson. (BAS)
July 13, 2012 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX124046 as to Alexa Kolbi-Molinas. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 13, 2012 13 Summons Issued as to Thomas C Horne, William Montgomery, Barbara Lawall, Arizona Medical Board, Lisa Wynn. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(REW). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 13, 2012 12 Featured Case ORDER. Hearing set as to 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 503, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge James A Teilborg. Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 7/19/2012. Reply due by noon, 7/23/2012. Joint Prehearing Statement due by 7/20/2012. Plaintiffs must deliver a copy of this Order to each Defendant by noon today. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/13/12. (JAT)
July 13, 2012 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Alexa Kolbi-Molinas by William Clewell, Hugh Miller. (Kolbi-Molinas, Alexa)
July 12, 2012 10 SUMMONS Submitted by William Clewell, Paul A Isaacson, Hugh Miller. (LaVoy, Christopher)
July 12, 2012 9 SUMMONS Submitted by William Clewell, Paul A Isaacson, Hugh Miller. (LaVoy, Christopher)
July 12, 2012 8 SUMMONS Submitted by William Clewell, Paul A Isaacson, Hugh Miller. (LaVoy, Christopher)
July 12, 2012 7 SUMMONS Submitted by William Clewell, Paul A Isaacson, Hugh Miller. (LaVoy, Christopher)
July 12, 2012 6 SUMMONS Submitted by William Clewell, Paul A Isaacson, Hugh Miller. (LaVoy, Christopher)
July 12, 2012 5 Featured Case STANDARD TRACK ORDER. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/12/2012. (TLB)
July 12, 2012 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX 0970-6994997. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A. Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 12-01501-PHX-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
July 12, 2012 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and EXPEDITED Consideration, or, in the Alternative, for a TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Plaintiffs William Clewell, Paul A Isaacson, Hugh Miller (submitted by Christopher LaVoy). (REK)
July 12, 2012 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and EXPEDITED consideration, or, in the Alternative, for a TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, with Accompanying Declarations, Memorandum of Law and Proposed Form of Order by William Clewell, Paul A Isaacson, Hugh Miller (submitted by Christopher LaVoy). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(REK)
July 12, 2012 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $350.00, receipt number PHX 0970-6994997, filed by William Clewell, Paul A Isaacson, Hugh Miller (submitted by Christopher LaVoy). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isaacson et al v. Horne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Wynn
Represented By: David Robert Cole
Represented By: Evan Franklin Hiller
Represented By: G Michael Tryon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas C Horne
Represented By: David Robert Cole
Represented By: Evan Franklin Hiller
Represented By: G Michael Tryon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Montgomery
Represented By: Louis Francis Comus, III
Represented By: Douglas L Irish
Represented By: Deryck Reid Lavelle
Represented By: J Kenneth Mangum
Represented By: Clarisse R McCormick
Represented By: William Gerard Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Lawall
Represented By: Paula J Perrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Medical Board
Represented By: David Robert Cole
Represented By: Evan Franklin Hiller
Represented By: G Michael Tryon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul A Isaacson
Represented By: Nancy R Thomas
Represented By: Janie Fay Schulman
Represented By: Christopher Alan LaVoy
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: David Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Clewell
Represented By: Alexa Kolbi-Molinas
Represented By: Kelly Joyce Flood
Represented By: Susan Talcott Camp
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugh Miller
Represented By: Susan Talcott Camp
Represented By: Kelly Joyce Flood
Represented By: Alexa Kolbi-Molinas
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?