Juniel v. Labcorp

Plaintiff: Joyce Juniel
Defendant: Labcorp
Case Number: 2:2012cv01539
Filed: July 17, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 67 Plaintiff's request to dismiss her case and 68 Stipulation to Dismiss: IT IS ORDERED that this case is dismissed without prejudice, each side to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion requesting referral to preliminary medical expert (Doc. 60 ) is found to be moot. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/6/13. (LAD)
May 24, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - 1. Defendants' motions to dismiss (Docs. 21 , 24 ) are granted. The HIPPA claim is dismissed with prejudice, and the other claims are dismissed without prejudice as discussed above. 2. Plaintiff's motion for written responses in stead of oral argument or delay of oral argument (Doc. 25 ) is denied as moot. 3. Plaintiff's motion to remove or sever Anasazi (Doc. 26 ) is granted. 4. Plaintiff's motion to delay any immediate dismissal (Doc. 34 ) is denied. 5. Plaintiff's complaint against Defendant Anasazi is dismissed without prejudice. 6. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint as to Defendant Labcorp on or before June 14, 2013. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/24/13. (LAD)
May 17, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - 1. Defendants' motions to dismiss (Docs. 21 , 24 ) are granted. The HIPPA claim is dismissed with prejudice, and the other claims are dismissed without prejudice as discussed above. 2. Plaintiff's motion for written responses in stead of oral argument or delay of oral argument (Doc. 25 ) is denied as moot. 3. Plaintiff's motion to remove or sever Anasazi (Doc. 26 ) is granted. 4. Plaintiff's motion to delay any immediate dismissal (Doc. 34 ) is denied. 5. Plaintiff's complaint against Defendant Anasazi is dismissed with prejudice. 6. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint as to Defendant Labcorp on or before June 14, 2013. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/17/13. (LAD)
December 14, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel (Doc. 11) is denied. 2. Plaintiff's emergency motions preventing Defendants from terminating her as a patient (Docs. 10, 12) are denied. 3. Plaintiff's complaint(s) are denied without prejudice. Plaintiff may file a single amended complaint on or before January 4, 2013. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/14/12.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juniel v. Labcorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Labcorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Juniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?