Cheeks v. General Dynamics et al

Plaintiff: Loretta H Cheeks
Defendant: General Dynamics C4 Systems Incorporated and General Dynamics Corporation
Case Number: 2:2012cv01543
Filed: July 17, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2015 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 179 Plaintiff's Rule 59 Motion for New Trial. See attached Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/23/2015.(TLB)
October 28, 2014 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Strike GDC4S' Motion for Attorneys' Fees (Doc. 113 ) is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees (Doc. 110 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED awarding Defendant, GDC4S $24,720.00 in attorneys' fees from Plaintiff, Ms. Cheeks. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/28/2014.(KMG)
May 19, 2014 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that consistent with the above, Plaintiff Loretta Cheek's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. 85 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that consistent with the above, Defendants General Dynamics Corporation and General Dynamics C4 Syst ems Incorporated's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 93 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. With respect to Defendant General Dynamics Corporation, summary judgment is granted on Counts Two, Three, and Seven. With respect to Defendant Gene ral Dynamics C4 Systems Incorporated, summary judgment is granted on Counts One, Two, Three, Four, Five, Six, and the Counterclaim. Summary judgment is denied on Count Seven. FURTHER ORDERED that the Parties are directed to confer in good faith to re solve any disputes concerning the amount of reasonable attorneys' fees and costs related to GDC4S's Counterclaim for Breach of Contract. See L.R. Civ. 54.2(d)(1). If the Parties are unable to agree, GDC4S may file a motion pursuant to Local Rule 54.2. Any such motion shall be filed, with a supporting memorandum, on or before June 27, 2014, with the response and reply briefs due in accordance with the time periods provided in Local Rule 54.2(b)(3) and (4). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant General Dynamics shall be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/19/2014.(KMG)
June 24, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order and File Amended Complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file her Fourth Amended Complaint (currently lodged at Doc. 44-1) within 5 days of the date of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED amending the Scheduling Order (Doc. 27) solely as follows: All discovery must be completed by 11/1/2013. All dispositive motions shall be filed no later than 12/9/2013. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/24/2013.(TLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheeks v. General Dynamics et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta H Cheeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics C4 Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Mark G Kisicki
Represented By: Elizabeth Mary Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Corporation
Represented By: Mark G Kisicki
Represented By: Elizabeth Mary Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?