Lowery v. Barcklay et al

Plaintiff: Christian Dale Lowery
Defendant: Unknown Barcklay, Unknown Hayden and Unknown Zaragosa
Case Number: 2:2012cv01625
Filed: July 30, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Yuma
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2015 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 73 ) and Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 73 ) is denied. Defen dant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 82 ) is granted,and the action is terminated with prejudice. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. See document for further details. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/28/2015.(REK)
April 22, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Plaintiff's 39 Motion for Summary Judgment and it is denied without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/17/2014.(LFIG)
January 7, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 15 , 18 Motions for Default Judgment are DENIED; Defendant's 23 Motion to Set Aside Default is GRANTED; Defendant's 24 Motion for Leave to File an Untimely Answer is GRANTED; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to immediately file the defendant's 25 Lodged Proposed Answer. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/6/2014.(LFIG)
June 12, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND ORDER that, on or before 7/1/13, Defendant Barcklay and the Arizona Attorney General's Office show cause in writing why a default judgment should not be entered against Defendant. ORDER that the Clerk of Court is kindly d irected to mail a copy of this Order to Defendant Barcklay at the address provided by Plaintiff on the service packet; Mr. Michael Gottfried via certified mail, return receipt requested and Mr. Terrence E. Harrison via certified mail, return receipt requested. ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Serve Notice 16 is denied. Plaintiff's Motion for Status 17 is granted. Plaintiff's two Motions for Default Judgment 15 and 18 are held in abeyance pending a response to this Order to Show Cause (please see attached order for complete information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 6/12/13. (TLJ)
September 6, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) Count II and Defendants Hayden and Zaragosa are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet for Defendant Barcklay. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Lawrence Anderson. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 9/5/12. (TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowery v. Barcklay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Dale Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Barcklay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Zaragosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?