McDaniel v. Fizer et al

Plaintiff: Tyson McDaniel
Defendant: Greg Fizer, Unknown Zabrosky, Unknown Becker and Unknown Miser
Case Number: 2:2012cv01697
Filed: August 9, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 1/27/14.(LSP)
October 29, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to McDaniel's 30 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and the Motion is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/29/2013.(LFIG)
September 30, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 33 Third Motion for Leave to Amend is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/29/2013.(LFIG)
July 26, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 26 Motion for Leave to Amend is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 7/26/2013.(LFIG)
May 9, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 15 Motion for Leave to Amend is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 5/8/2013.(LFIG)
January 24, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet): ORDERED that Count Three is dismissed without prejudice; Defendants Ryan, Duarte and Silves are dismissed without prejudice. Defendants Mason, Miser and Becker must answer Count One and Two; Defendants Fizer, Bohuszewicz an d Zabrosky must answer Count Two. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the 7 First Amended Complaint, this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for the above Defendants. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Lawrence O. Anderson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/24/2013. (LFIG)
October 15, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is granted and Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee. The 1 Complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 dyas from the date this Order i s filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The Clerk must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/15/2012. (LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniel v. Fizer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyson McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Fizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Zabrosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Miser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?