National Association for the Advancement of Multijurisdiction Practice et al v. Arizona Supreme Court et al

Plaintiff: National Association for the Advancement of Multijurisdiction Practice, Allison Girvin and Mark Anderson
Defendant: W Scott Bales, John Pelander, Robert M Brutinel, Rebecca White Berch and Arizona Supreme Court
Case Number: 2:2012cv01724
Filed: August 13, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2013 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 98 Plaintiffs' Motion to Submit Additional Evidence and Supplement the Record for Appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 10/18/13.(TLJ)
September 19, 2013 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion for Hearing 84 is denied. ORDER that Plaintiffs' Requests to Take Judicial Notice 87 and 88 are granted. ORDER that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 54 is granted and that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs and shall terminate this action. ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 28 is denied. ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 52 is denied as moot. ORDER t hat the Motion for "Order Admitting [Kolman] 90 is denied for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Join Party 93 is denied (please see attached order for complete information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 9/19/13.(TLJ)
March 6, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Grant Joseph Savoy SHALL SHOW CAUSE why his pro hac vice status in this Court should not be terminated or why he should not otherwise be disciplined. See LRCiv. 83.2(a), (e). Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court set up a sep arate proceeding with a miscellaneous case number for the transfer and adjudication of this Order to Show Cause. FURTHER ORDERED that the miscellaneous case number be reassigned, by lot, to another Judge in the District of Arizona. The Clerk is dire cted that Judge G. Murray Snow shall not be selected to rule on the Order to Show Cause. FURTHER ORDERED that this Miscellaneous Case has been reassigned by random lot to the Honorable David G. Campbell. All future proceedings and papers submitted shall bear the following complete case number: MC-13-00014-PHX-DGC. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/6/13. (MAP)
December 18, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 19 is denied as moot; Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend 21 is granted; Plaintiffs are directed to file and serve the Second Amended Complaint within 14 days; Defendants' Motion to Stay 29 is denied; Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time 31 is granted; Defendants shall have to and including 1/18/13 in which to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 28 . Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/18/12. (REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Association for the Advancement of Multijurisdiction Practice et al v. Arizona Supreme Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Scott Bales
Represented By: Eryn Marie McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Pelander
Represented By: Eryn Marie McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M Brutinel
Represented By: Eryn Marie McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca White Berch
Represented By: Eryn Marie McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Supreme Court
Represented By: Eryn Marie McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Association for the Advancement of Multijurisdiction Practice
Represented By: Grant Joseph Savoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Girvin
Represented By: Grant Joseph Savoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Anderson
Represented By: Grant Joseph Savoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?