Skinner #193387 v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: James E Skinner
Defendant: Charles L Ryan, Ron Credio, Lance Hefner, Craig Fizer, Antonio Barrios, Unknown Kane, J Heet, Unknown Long, Susan Zabocsky, Rita Duarte, Unknown Silves, Unknown Quintero, Unknown Alvarez, Duane Bohuszewicz, Unknown Tillman, Unknown Garcia, Diane Bohuszewicz and Unknown Trianna
Case Number: 2:2012cv01729
Filed: August 14, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2015 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 176 ). Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 176 ) is granted. Ryan, Silves, Fizer, Hetmer, Kane, Triana, Heet, Tillman, Bohuszewicz, Long, Barrios, Zaborsky, and Alvarez are dismissed as Defendants. The remaining claim is Skinner's Eighth Amendment conditions-of-confinement claim against Duarte. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 06/22/15. (ATD)
April 21, 2015 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 194 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying 191 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions and denying Defendants' request to sanction Plaintiff's counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating the Court's Order of March 12, 2014 (Doc. 134 ) and reinstating the case as to Defendant Rita J. Duarte. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Willett for further proceedings. Counsel for Defendants provide to Magistra te Judge Willett by Friday April 24, 2015 the current, correct address for Defendant Rita J. Duarte. Alternatively, counsel for Defendants may file a Notice Accepting Service of Process on behalf of Defendant Rita J. Duarte. The Clerk shall provid e Defendant Duarte's address to USMS with a Service Packet including this Order, a copy of the Marshal's Process Receipt & Return form (USM-285) and Notice of Lawsuit & Request for Waiver of Service of Summons form for Defendant Duarte. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED extending the time for service of process for Defendant Duarte until Friday, June 26, 2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED permitting additional, limited discovery regarding Defendant Rita J. Duarte by extending the discovery deadlines for 60 days from the date an Answer or other responsive motion is filed by Defendant Rita J. Duarte. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall forward a copy of this Order to Magistrate Judge Willett. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/20/15. (LSP)
July 7, 2014 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 113 Motion to Compel Discovery. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 7/3/14. (LAD)
June 30, 2014 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 145 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. The Motion is granted as to Plaintiff's third request for production to Defendant Alvarez. Defendant's counsel shall produce any documents responsive to the request no later than Monday, July 7, 2014. The Motion is denied as to Plaintiff's other two requests for production. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 6/30/14.(LSP)
May 13, 2014 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 102 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery and denying 115 Plaintiff's Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 5/13/14.(LSP)
January 10, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 60 Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment Against Defendant Susan Zaborsky and granting 67 Defendant Zaborsky's Motion for Leave to File Untimely Answer. Clerk is kindly directed to file Defendant Zaborsky's Notice of Joinder, currently lodged at (Doc. 68 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 1/10/14.(LSP)
January 8, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 48 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Defense counsel shall promptly respond to Plaintiff's letter in a good faith attempt to avoid judicial involvement in this discovery dispute or narrow the issues upon which the parties disagree. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 1/8/14.(LSP)
August 2, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend First AmendedComplaint, doc. 33 , and Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Court's Order, doc. 34 , are WITHDRAWN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave of Court to Amend First Amended Complaint, doc. 39, is DENIED. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 8/2/13. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skinner #193387 v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Credio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Hefner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Fizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Barrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Heet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Zabocsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita Duarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Silves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Quintero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Bohuszewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Bohuszewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Trianna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?