Martinez et al v. Avondale, City of et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Martinez, Sr. and Marisol Martinez
Defendant: Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2012cv01837
Filed: August 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER pursuant to the parties' #165 Stipulation. ORDERED that this case is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 4/29/2014. (LFIG)
April 28, 2014 Filing 165 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Robbins, Joel)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER that Plaintiffs' #161 Petition to Approve Minors' Settlement is GRANTED. The parties must provide the Court with a stipulation for dismissal with prejudice and separate order no later than May 9, 2014, unless extended by the Court upon a showing of good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 3/6/2014.(LFIG)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER that the Court will VACATE as unnecessary the Final Settlement Approval Hearing scheduled for Tuesday, March 4, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. An order will be entered shortly on Plaintiffs' #161 Petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 2/2/2014. (LFIG)
March 3, 2014 Filing 162 RESPONSE to Motion re: #161 MOTION to Approve Minors' Settlement filed by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger, Unknown Parties. (Hamilton, April)
March 3, 2014 Filing 161 MOTION to Approve Minors' Settlement by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Robbins, Joel)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER denying #158 Motion for Leave to File Petition for Approval of Settlement of Minors' Claims Under Seal. Plaintiffs must file their Petition to Approve Minors' Settlement as a public document on or before Monday, March 3, 2014 at 3:00 p.m. or the Petition to Approve Minors' Settlement may be denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 2/28/14.(MAP)
February 27, 2014 Filing 159 *DENIED By Order #160 *SEALED LODGED Proposed Petition to Approve Minors' Settlement re: #158 MOTION to Seal Document . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel) *Modified on 2/28/2014 (MAP)*.
February 27, 2014 Filing 158 MOTION to Seal Document by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Robbins, Joel)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER that until the Court approves each minor's settlement, the parties' settlement shall not be final and no settlement money shall be paid. ORDERED setting a Final Settlement Approval Hearing on Tuesday, March 4, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 302, Sandra Day O'Connor U. S. Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona for the purpose of determining the fairness of the settlement vis a vis each minor Plaintiff in this action. All adult Plaintiffs and counsel for the parties shall be physically present. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference scheduled for Tuesday, March 4, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. is hereby VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 2/18/2014. (LFIG)
February 14, 2014 Filing 156 NOTICE of Settlement by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER setting an informal Rule 16(b) scheduling conference before the undersigned on Tuesday, March 4, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. in Suite 322, Sandra Day OConnor U. S. Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 1/17/2014. (See attached PDF for complete information)(ALS)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #143 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Summary judgment is hereby granted on Plaintiffs' 1983 claims of violations of their Fourteenth Amendment rights to procedural and substantive due process as either alleged in Count 5 or otherwise alleged in Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. All other grounds for summary judgment is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 1/15/14.(LSP)
December 19, 2013 Filing 153 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS re #152 Reply to Response to Motion Defendants' Supplemental Statement of Facts in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger. (Calderon, Ernest)
December 19, 2013 Filing 152 REPLY to Response to Motion re #143 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger. (Calderon, Ernest)
December 4, 2013 Filing 151 NOTICE of Errata re #150 Statement, by Plaintiffs Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-26)(Robbins, Joel)
December 2, 2013 Filing 150 STATEMENT of Facts re #149 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, #144 Stipulated Facts re Motion for Summary Judgment, #143 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-26)(Robbins, Joel)
December 2, 2013 Filing 149 RESPONSE to Motion re #143 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Robbins, Joel)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER that Defendants' #129 Motion for Contempt is hereby WITHDRAWN and the November 15, 2013 Order to Show Cause Contempt Hearing against Sharon Jenny Nunez-Sepulveda is hereby VACATED. The Clerk of Court is kindly directed to mail a signed copy of this Order to Sharon Jenny Nunez-Sepulveda. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/14/2013. (LFIG)
November 13, 2013 Filing 147 *Withdrawl of Document re #129 MOTION for Contempt Withdrawal of Motion for Contempt and Request to Vacate OSC Hearing Set for November 15, 2013 at 2:00pm by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger. (Calderon, Ernest) *Modified to correct event on 11/14/2013 (LFIG).
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER that Plaintiffs shall have until Tuesday, December 2, 2013 within which to respond to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants may file a reply within 18 days after Plaintiffs' response. That the motion shall be deemed to be ready for decision without oral argument on the day following the date set for filing the reply unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/12/2013. (LFIG)
November 6, 2013 Filing 145 NOTICE of Deposition of Sharon Nunez, filed by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger. (Calderon, Ernest)
November 1, 2013 Filing 144 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS re #143 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger. (Calderon, Ernest)
November 1, 2013 Filing 143 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger. (Calderon, Ernest)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Separate Statement of Facts #140 , #141 , but not the exhibits thereto, are hereby stricken without prejudice; Defendants may re-file their Motion for Summary Judgment and Separate Statement of Facts by 11/5/13, which shall comply in all respects with this Order and the District Court's Local Rules or Defendants' Motion will be summarily denied; Defendants are not required to re-file their exhibits/attachments to their Statement of Facts at #141 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/31/13. (REW)
October 30, 2013 Filing 141 *Statement (but not exhibits), STRICKEN by Order #142 - STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS re #140 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibits 5-9, #6 Exhibits 10-11, #7 Exhibit 12, #8 Exhibit 13)(Calderon, Ernest)
October 30, 2013 Filing 140 STRICKEN by Order #142 - MOTION for Summary Judgment by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger. (Calderon, Ernest)
October 24, 2013 Filing 139 SERVICE EXECUTED : Notice of Service re Subpoena, Order to Show Cause upon Sharon Jenny Nunez-Sepulveda on 10/22/2013. (ALS)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' request for an order to show cause is GRANTED and Defendants' Motion for Contempt #129 is DEFERRED pending the OSC hearing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Sharon Jenny Nunez-Sepulveda is hereby ORDERED to physically appear before the undersigned Magistrate Judge on Friday, November 15, 2013 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 302, Third Floor, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Courthouse, 401 W. Washington, Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2120, and show cause why she should not be held in contempt and sanctioned for her failure to comply with the subpoena and appear for her September 25, 2013 deposition. If Sharon Jenny Nunez-Sepulveda arranges and completes her deposition prior to Friday, November 15, 2013 at 2:00 p.m., she will mitigate the contempt sanctions imposed on her at the OSC hearing. Her wilful failure to comply with this Order and Order to Show Cause may subject Sharon Jenny Nunez-Sepulveda to the contempt sanctions discussed herein and may result in her arrest by the United States Marshals Service. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshals Service is hereby directed to personally serve a signed copy of this Order and Order to Show Cause on Sharon Jenny Nunez-Sepulveda at 8124 W. Whitton Ave., Phoenix, AZ 85033 or other address where she may be located as soon as is practicable. The United States Marshals Service shall promptly file a return of service upon the service of this Order and Order to Show Cause. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties' Second Motion to Continue Discovery Deadline, doc. #130 , is DENIED, except that the deposition of Ms. Nunez-Sepulveda may be taken after the discovery deadline upon either her full cooperation or arrest and detention. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/17/13. (LAD) (vlg emailed to USMS for service of process on 10/17/13)
October 16, 2013 Filing 137 RESPONSE to Motion re #129 MOTION Contempt filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
October 15, 2013 Filing 136 *Additional Attachments to Main Document, Exhibits re #135 Affidavit filed by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger. (Calderon, Ernest) *Modified to correct event on 10/15/2013 (LFIG).
October 15, 2013 Filing 135 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #129 MOTION Contempt filed by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger. (Calderon, Ernest)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER that Defendants' #133 Affidavit is hereby STRICKEN without prejudice. ORDERED that Defendants shall re-file Defendants' Affidavit on or before Friday, October 18, 2013, which shall comply in all respects with this Order and the District Court's Local Rules or Defendants Motion for Contempt will be summarily denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/15/2013. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)
October 14, 2013 Filing 133 STRICKEN by Doc. #134 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #129 MOTION Contempt filed by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger. (Calderon, Ernest) Modified on 10/15/2013 (LFIG).
October 11, 2013 Filing 132 IT IS ORDERED: As additional attachments, Defendants' counsel shall promptly file copies of the subpoena purportedly served on Sharon Jenny Nunez-Sepulveda on August 7, 2013, the process server's affidavit of service to demonstrate she was properly served, and a brief affidavit of counsel of his or her good-faith understanding of Nunez-Sepulveda's role or importance to this action, or Defendants Motion for Contempt will be denied. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SMH)
October 7, 2013 Filing 131 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #130 Second MOTION to Continue Discovery Deadline SECOND JOINT STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY DEADLINE by Defendants Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Calderon, Ernest)
October 7, 2013 Filing 130 Second MOTION to Continue Discovery Deadline SECOND JOINT STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY DEADLINE by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger. (Calderon, Ernest)
October 7, 2013 Filing 129 WITHDRAWN by Doc. #147 MOTION Contempt by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-4)(Calderon, Ernest) Modified on 11/14/2013 (LFIG).
August 29, 2013 Filing 128 NOTICE of Deposition of Barrie Wagner, filed by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger, Unknown Parties. (Hamilton, April)
August 20, 2013 Filing 127 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger, Unknown Parties. (Hamilton, April)
August 15, 2013 Filing 126 NOTICE of Deposition of First Amended Notice of Deposition of Roger Clark, filed by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger. (Hamilton, April)
August 14, 2013 Filing 125 NOTICE of Deposition of Alexander Jason, filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
August 12, 2013 Filing 124 NOTICE of Deposition of Jesse Wobrock, filed by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger, Unknown Parties. (Hamilton, April)
August 12, 2013 Filing 123 NOTICE of Deposition of Roger Clark, filed by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger, Unknown Parties. (Hamilton, April)
August 9, 2013 Filing 122 NOTICE of Deposition of Alexander Jason, filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
August 7, 2013 Filing 121 NOTICE of Deposition of Barrie Wagner, filed by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger, Unknown Parties. (Hamilton, April)
August 7, 2013 Filing 120 NOTICE of Deposition of Sharon Jenny Nunez-Sepulveda, filed by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger, Unknown Parties. (Hamilton, April)
July 26, 2013 Filing 119 NOTICE of Deposition of Jill Hayes, Ph.D., filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
July 25, 2013 Filing 118 NOTICE of Deposition of Bennie Click, filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
July 25, 2013 Filing 117 NOTICE of Deposition of Jill Hayes, Ph.D., filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
July 25, 2013 Filing 116 NOTICE of Deposition of Bennie Click, filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
July 15, 2013 Filing 115 NOTICE re Sevice of Plaintiffs' 15th and 16th Supplemental Disclosure Statements by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez . (Robbins, Joel)
July 8, 2013 Filing 114 NOTICE re of Service of Discovery Responses by Avondale, City of . (Hamilton, April)
June 21, 2013 Filing 113 NOTICE re OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS' SEVENTH SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger . (Hamilton, April)
June 5, 2013 Filing 112 NOTICE re Service of Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Discovery Upon Defendants by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez . (Robbins, Joel)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER that the parties' #110 Joint Stipulated Motion to Continue Discovery Deadline is GRANTED. Discovery due by 9/30/2013. Dispositive motions due by 10/30/2013. A cross-motion for summary judgment on an issue directly related to an adverse parties' summary judgment motion may be filed on or before Friday, November 29, 2013 as more fully set forth in the Court's #17 Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 6/3/2013. (LFIG)
June 3, 2013 Filing 110 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hamilton, April)
May 23, 2013 Filing 109 NOTICE of Deposition of Stephen Nunez, filed by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger. (Hamilton, April)
May 20, 2013 Filing 108 NOTICE re of Service of Defendants' Sixth Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger . (Hamilton, April)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER that the parties' #106 Stipulation is GRANTED. The expert disclosure deadlines are hereby extended. ORDERED affirming all other deadlines in the Court's #17 Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 5/20/2013. (LFIG)
May 15, 2013 Filing 106 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE EXPERT DISCLOSURE DEADLINES by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hamilton, April)
May 9, 2013 Filing 105 NOTICE re of Service of Defendants' Fifth Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger . (Hamilton, April)
May 3, 2013 Filing 104 NOTICE of Deposition of Robert Clement, filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
May 3, 2013 Filing 103 NOTICE of Deposition of Edward Toxqui, filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
May 3, 2013 Filing 102 NOTICE of Deposition of Jonathan Martin, filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
May 3, 2013 Filing 101 NOTICE of Deposition of Reginald Sayles, filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
May 3, 2013 Filing 100 NOTICE of Deposition of Michael Unger, filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
May 3, 2013 Filing 99 NOTICE of Deposition of Raymond Harris, filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
May 1, 2013 Filing 98 NOTICE re Service of Plaintiffs' 14th Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez . (Robbins, Joel)
April 30, 2013 Filing 97 NOTICE of Deposition of Randy Stonecipher, filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
April 25, 2013 Filing 96 NOTICE re of Service of Fourth Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger . (Hamilton, April)
April 17, 2013 Filing 95 *ANSWER to #76 Second Amended Complaint by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger.(Hamilton, April) *Modified to add link on 4/18/2013 (LFIG).
April 9, 2013 Filing 94 NOTICE re of Service of Discovery Responses by Avondale, City of, Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Kevin Sapp, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, Michael Unger . (Hamilton, April)
April 8, 2013 Filing 93 NOTICE re Service of Plaintiffs' 12th Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez . (Robbins, Joel)
April 5, 2013 Filing 92 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez upon Reginald Sayles (Robbins, Joel)
April 5, 2013 Filing 91 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez upon Edward Toxqui (Robbins, Joel)
April 5, 2013 Filing 90 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez upon Raymond Harris (Robbins, Joel)
April 5, 2013 Filing 89 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez upon Christopher Beckett (Robbins, Joel)
April 5, 2013 Filing 88 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez upon Robert Clement (Robbins, Joel)
April 5, 2013 Filing 87 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez upon Albert Bates (Robbins, Joel)
April 5, 2013 Filing 86 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez upon Michael Unger (Robbins, Joel)
April 1, 2013 Filing 85 NOTICE re Service of Plaintiffs' Eleventh Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez . (Robbins, Joel)
March 28, 2013 Filing 84 Summons Issued as to Albert Bates, Christopher Beckett, Robert Clement, Raymond Harris, Reginald Sayles, Edward Toxqui, and Michael Unger. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(MHU). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 28, 2013 Filing 83 SUMMONS Submitted by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
March 28, 2013 Filing 82 SUMMONS Submitted by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
March 28, 2013 Filing 81 SUMMONS Submitted by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
March 28, 2013 Filing 80 SUMMONS Submitted by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
March 28, 2013 Filing 79 SUMMONS Submitted by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
March 28, 2013 Filing 78 SUMMONS Submitted by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
March 28, 2013 Filing 77 SUMMONS Submitted by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
March 25, 2013 Filing 76 *SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez.(Robbins, Joel) *Modified to add text on 4/18/2013 (LFIG).
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER that Plaintiffs' #63 Motion to Amend Complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiffs must 1) remove all fictitious defendants named as John and Jane Does I-X and Black Entities I-V in the caption and body of the Second Amended Complaint; 2) remove all bolding in the caption of the Second Amended Complaint as such bolding is not authorized by the Local Rules; and 3) file the Second Amended Complaint, lodged at doc. 63-1 as modified by this Order, on all parties under Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within seven (7) days of the filing of this Order and promptly serve all Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 3/22/2013.(LFIG)
March 21, 2013 Filing 74 NOTICE of Deposition of Stephen Nunez, filed by Avondale, City of, Kevin Sapp. (Hamilton, April)
March 21, 2013 Filing 73 NOTICE of Deposition of Stephen Nunez, filed by Avondale, City of, Kevin Sapp. (Hamilton, April)
March 18, 2013 Filing 72 REPLY to Response to Motion re #63 MOTION to Amend/Correct #19 Amended Complaint filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
March 15, 2013 Filing 71 NOTICE re Service of Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Response to Defendants' Request for Production of Documents by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez . (Robbins, Joel)
March 13, 2013 Filing 70 NOTICE re Service of Plaintiffs' Tenth Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez . (Robbins, Joel)
March 13, 2013 Filing 69 RESPONSE to Motion re #63 MOTION to Amend/Correct #19 Amended Complaint filed by Avondale, City of, Kevin Sapp. (Hamilton, April)
March 8, 2013 Filing 68 NOTICE re Service of Plaintiffs' Ninth Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez . (Robbins, Joel)
March 6, 2013 Filing 67 NOTICE re Service of Plaintiffs' Eighth Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez . (Robbins, Joel)
March 6, 2013 Filing 66 NOTICE of Deposition of Christopher Beckett, filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
March 4, 2013 Filing 65 NOTICE re Service of 7th Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez . (Robbins, Joel)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER that Defendants' Response to the #63 Motion to Amend Complaint, must be filed on or before Wednesday, March 13, 2013. Plaintiffs' optional Reply, if any, must be filed on or before Monday, March 18, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 3/4/2013. (LFIG)
March 1, 2013 Filing 63 MOTION to Amend/Correct #19 Amended Complaint by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Robbins, Joel)
February 28, 2013 Filing 62 NOTICE re Service of Plaintiffs' Third Set of Discovery Requests Upon Defendants by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez . (Robbins, Joel)
February 28, 2013 Filing 61 NOTICE of Deposition of Gregory Martinez, Sr., filed by Avondale, City of, Kevin Sapp. (Hamilton, April)
February 28, 2013 Filing 60 NOTICE re Service of Plaintiffs' 6th Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez . (Robbins, Joel)
February 27, 2013 Filing 59 NOTICE of Deposition of Marissa Martinez, filed by Avondale, City of, Kevin Sapp. (Hamilton, April)
February 27, 2013 Filing 58 NOTICE of Deposition of Marisol Martinez, filed by Avondale, City of, Kevin Sapp. (Hamilton, April)
February 27, 2013 Filing 57 NOTICE of Deposition of Gregory Martinez, Sr., filed by Avondale, City of, Kevin Sapp. (Hamilton, April)
February 27, 2013 Filing 56 NOTICE re of Service of Third Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Avondale, City of, Kevin Sapp . (Hamilton, April)
February 26, 2013 Filing 55 NOTICE re Service of Plaintiffs' 5th Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez . (Robbins, Joel)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion for One-Month Extension of Expert Disclosure Deadlines, doc. #46 , is conditionally GRANTED. The Court conditionally extends all parties' expert disclosure deadlines by 30 days, provided, in Defendants' sole discretion, Plaintiffs agree to reschedule the depositions of Plaintiffs Gregory Martinez, Sr., Marisol Martinez, and Marissa Martinez to mutually-agreeable dates and times before discovery closes after Plaintiffs' expert disclosure before discovery closes. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, consistent with this Order, Plaintiffs' expert disclosure deadline is extended to March 29, 2013; Defendants' expert disclosure deadline is extended to May 17, 2013; and rebuttal expert disclosures are extended to June 14, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 2/25/2013.(KMG)
February 22, 2013 Filing 53 NOTICE re of Service of Second Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Avondale, City of, Kevin Sapp . (Hamilton, April)
February 20, 2013 Filing 52 NOTICE of Deposition of Stephen Nunez, filed by Avondale, City of, Kevin Sapp. (Hamilton, April)
February 18, 2013 Filing 51 REPLY to Response to Motion re #46 First MOTION for Extension of Time Expert Disclosure Deadlines filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Robbins, Joel)
February 14, 2013 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #46 First MOTION for Extension of Time Expert Disclosure Deadlines filed by Avondale, City of, Kevin Sapp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Hamilton, April)
February 13, 2013 Filing 49 NOTICE re Service of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Response to Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez . (Robbins, Joel)
February 12, 2013 Filing 48 NOTICE re of Service of First Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Avondale, City of, Kevin Sapp . (Hamilton, April)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' #46 Motion for One-Month Extension of Expert Disclosure Deadlines must be filed on or before Friday, February 15, 2013. Plaintiffs' optional Reply, if any, must be filed on or before Tuesday, February 19, 2013. Plaintiffs' Motion will be ripe for ruling without oral argument after Tuesday, February 19, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 2/8/2013. (LFIG)
February 7, 2013 Filing 46 First MOTION for Extension of Time Expert Disclosure Deadlines by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Robbins, Joel)
February 7, 2013 Filing 45 NOTICE re Service of 4th Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez . (Robbins, Joel)
February 7, 2013 Filing 44 NOTICE of Deposition of Terry Sapp, filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
February 7, 2013 Filing 43 NOTICE of Deposition of Kevin Sapp, filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
February 1, 2013 Filing 42 NOTICE of Deposition of Christopher Beckett, filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
January 31, 2013 Filing 41 NOTICE re Service of Plaintiffs' Third Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez . (Robbins, Joel)
January 28, 2013 Filing 40 NOTICE of Deposition of Lucy Martinez, filed by Avondale, City of, Kevin Sapp. (Hamilton, April)
January 28, 2013 Filing 39 NOTICE of Deposition of Marissa Martinez, filed by Avondale, City of, Kevin Sapp. (Hamilton, April)
January 28, 2013 Filing 38 NOTICE of Deposition of Marisol Martinez, filed by Avondale, City of, Kevin Sapp. (Hamilton, April)
January 28, 2013 Filing 37 NOTICE of Deposition of Gregory Martinez, Sr., filed by Avondale, City of, Kevin Sapp. (Hamilton, April)
January 28, 2013 Filing 36 NOTICE of Deposition of Isaiah Martinez, filed by Avondale, City of, Kevin Sapp. (Hamilton, April)
January 24, 2013 Filing 35 NOTICE of Deposition of William Johnston, filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
January 8, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE re Service of Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez . (Robbins, Joel)
January 2, 2013 Filing 33 NOTICE of Deposition of Lenin Contreras, filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
December 14, 2012 Filing 32 NOTICE of Deposition of Albert Bates, filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
December 14, 2012 Filing 31 NOTICE of Deposition of Christopher Beckett, filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
December 14, 2012 Filing 30 NOTICE of Deposition of Terry Sapp, filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
December 14, 2012 Filing 29 NOTICE of Deposition of Kevin Sapp, filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
December 13, 2012 Filing 28 NOTICE re Service of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' First Set of Discovery Requests Upon Plaintiffs by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez . (Robbins, Joel)
December 10, 2012 Filing 27 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Discovery Responses by Avondale, City of, Kevin Sapp . (Hamilton, April)
November 12, 2012 Filing 26 Defendants Amended ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by Avondale, City of, Kevin Sapp.(Hamilton, April)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that the parties' #20 Stipulation is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED appointing Gregory Martinez, Sr. as Guardian Ad Litem Pendente Lite for I.M., M.M., and L.M. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/8/2012. (LFIG)
November 9, 2012 Filing 24 NOTICE re Service of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Discovery Upon Defendants by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez . (Robbins, Joel)
November 8, 2012 Filing 23 NOTICE re of Service of Discovery Requests by Avondale, City of, Kevin Sapp . (Hamilton, April)
November 6, 2012 Filing 22 NOTICE re of Service of Discovery Responses by Avondale, City of, Kevin Sapp . (Hamilton, April)
November 6, 2012 Filing 21 NOTICE re Service of Plaintiffs' First Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez . (Robbins, Joel)
November 1, 2012 Filing 20 STIPULATION Regarding Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Pendente Lite by Avondale, City of, Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez, Kevin Sapp. (Robbins, Joel)
October 30, 2012 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Avondale, City of, Kevin Sapp, filed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez.(Robbins, Joel)
October 24, 2012 Filing 18 Minute Entry. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Lawrence O. Anderson on 10/23/2012. Present were Joel B. Robbins, counsel for Plaintiffs; April M. Hamilton and Ernest Calderon, counsel for Defendants, and John Masterson on behalf of the excess carrier. A court reporter is not present nor were the proceedings tape recorded. Rule 16 Scheduling Order issued at docket #17. (vlg) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/31/2013. Dispositive motions due by 8/30/2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' #13 Motion to Amend Complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiffs must file the proposed First Amended Complaint, (Doc. 13-1 at 2-11), in appropriate Local Rules' format by Friday, November 2, 2012, with its caption consistent with this Scheduling Order; Defendants Does I-X and Black Corporations I-V are dismissed without prejudice; counsel shall use the above caption, number and initials on all further pleadings, briefings and other filings herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/23/2012. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)
October 19, 2012 Filing 16 NOTICE re Service of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosure Statement by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez . (Robbins, Joel)
October 19, 2012 Filing 15 NOTICE re Service of Defendants' Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosure by Avondale, City of, Kevin Sapp . (Hamilton, April)
October 19, 2012 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by April Marie Hamilton. (Hamilton, April)
October 19, 2012 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Redlined Complaint)(Robbins, Joel)
October 16, 2012 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Avondale, City of, Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez, Kevin Sapp. (Robbins, Joel)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference for 10/23/2012 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/20/2012. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)
September 12, 2012 Filing 10 NOTICE re of Service of Plaintiffs' First Set of Discovery Requests Upon Defendants by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez . (Robbins, Joel)
September 11, 2012 Filing 9 Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Lawrence O. Anderson conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 11, 2012 Filing 8 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 6, 2012 Filing 6 REQUEST re: for Rule 16 Conference by Plaintiffs Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. (Robbins, Joel)
September 4, 2012 Filing 7 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KMG)
September 4, 2012 Filing 5 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Avondale, City of, Kevin Sapp.(Hamilton, April)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT AND ORDER: ORDERED that Plaintiffs and Defendants shall file their written election to either consent to magistrate-judge jurisdiction or elect to proceed before a United States district judge on or before Wednesday, September 12, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel and any party, if unrepresented, shall hereinafter comply with the Rules of Practice for the United States District Court for the District of Arizona. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 8/31/2012. (See attached PDF for complete details.)(LFIG)
August 29, 2012 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX 0970-7174749. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Lawrence O. Anderson. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 12-01837-PHX-LOA. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(REK)
August 29, 2012 *****State Court record received on 8/29/2012*****SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. Kevin Sapp served on 8/12/2012.*****Certificate of Service by a Private Person filed in State Court on 8/13/2012, docketed in U.S. District Court on 8/29/2012 for case management purposes.***** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
August 29, 2012 *****State Court record received on 8/29/2012*****SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory Martinez, Sr, Marisol Martinez. Avondale, City of served on 8/9/2012.*****Certificate of Service by a Private Person filed in State Court on 8/13/2012, docketed in U.S. District Court on 8/29/2012 for case management purposes.***** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
August 29, 2012 Filing 2 NOTICE/ Verification of Transmission of State Court Documents by Avondale, City of, Kevin Sapp re #1 Notice of Removal (submitted by April Hamilton). (REK)
August 29, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2012-011344 Filing fee received: $350.00, receipt number PHX 0970-7174749, filed by Kevin Sapp, Avondale, City of (submitted by April Hamilton). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez et al v. Avondale, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Martinez, Sr.
Represented By: Anne E Findling
Represented By: Joel B Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisol Martinez
Represented By: Anne E Findling
Represented By: Joel B Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avondale, City of
Represented By: Ernest Calderon
Represented By: April Marie Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Bates
Represented By: Ernest Calderon
Represented By: April Marie Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Beckett
Represented By: Ernest Calderon
Represented By: April Marie Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Clement
Represented By: Ernest Calderon
Represented By: April Marie Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Harris
Represented By: Ernest Calderon
Represented By: April Marie Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Sapp
Represented By: Ernest Calderon
Represented By: April Marie Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald Sayles
Represented By: Ernest Calderon
Represented By: April Marie Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Toxqui
Represented By: Ernest Calderon
Represented By: April Marie Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Unger
Represented By: Ernest Calderon
Represented By: April Marie Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?