Jones v. Colorado Casualty Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Anthony H Jones
Defendant: Colorado Casualty Insurance Company, Trudy A Spratta and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2012cv01968
Filed: September 17, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2015 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 147 Colorado Casualty's Motion in Limine for an Order Precluding or Limiting the Testimony of Dr. Dewanjee and Request for Rule 104(a) Hearing. The motion is granted to preclude Dr. Dewanjee from te stifying as an expert at trial, but he will be permitted totestify as a percipient witness. Colorado Casualty's request for a Rule 104(a) hearing is denied as moot. See attached Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/19/2015.(TLB)
September 24, 2015 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 180 Motion to Seal. The Clerk shall seal Exhibits A through E to Defendant's original Motion in Limine No. 10 which is currently filed at Docket 153 . FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot 153 Motion in Limine. FURTHER ORDERED That Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 10 (Doc. 176 ) will remain as his response to Defendant's newly-filed Motion in Limine No. 10 (Doc. 182 ). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/24/15.(MAP)
April 21, 2015 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denied in part 121 Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Motion for Parial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's bad faith claim will proceed to trial, and Plaintiff's punitive damages claim is dismissed. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/21/2015.(TLB)
December 3, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Colorado Casualty Insurance Company's Motion to Seal Portions of its Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Documentation, (Doc. 98 ), is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Sea l, (Doc. 105 ), is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Colorado Casualty Insurance Companys Motion to Seal Portions of its Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Documentation, (Doc. 112 ), is DENI ED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED striking Docs. 99 , 103 , 104 , 109 , 110 , and 111 . These documents shall remain under seal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties' proposed protective order, (Doc. 97 ), is REJECTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the oral argument scheduled for December 17, 2014, (Doc. 114), is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with the Court's procedure as set forth in this Order concerning the filing of Defendant's motion to file unde r seal. Defendant shall file its motions to file under seal within fourteen days from the date of this Order, with any responses due within the time period prescribed by Local Rule 7.2(c). (See document for full details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 12/3/14. (LAD)
September 4, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Defendant Trudy A. Spratta's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's claims against her. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/4/13.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Colorado Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony H Jones
Represented By: Michael Patrick Doyle
Represented By: Jeffrey Lewis Raizner
Represented By: Kevin B Wein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Cassandra Victoria Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trudy A Spratta
Represented By: Cassandra Victoria Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?