Bloom v. United States Department of the Treasury

Petitioner: Joshua Bloom
Respondent: United States Department of the Treasury
Case Number: 2:2012cv01999
Filed: September 19, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1355 Petition for Return of Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the 23 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner or his legal guardian must file a notice of appeal on or before January 20, 2014. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/9/2013.(LFIG)
September 20, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Bloom's 14 Motion to Set Aside Default, Re-Open Cases and Unseal Documents. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/19/2013.(LFIG)
January 28, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 1 Petitioner's Petition for Release of Property. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/28/13.(DMT)
January 15, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the 7 Motion to Seal; the Clerk shall file the documents lodged at doc. 8 under seal; granting the 9 Motion to transfer; the Clerk shall transfer CV 12-2337-PHX-BSB to the undersigned. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/14/13.(REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bloom v. United States Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joshua Bloom
Represented By: Nathan Edward Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of the Treasury
Represented By: Reid Charles Pixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?