Beltran v. Martinez

Plaintiff: Jose Carrera Beltran
Defendant: Rosa Martinez
Case Number: 2:2012cv02023
Filed: September 24, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Steven P Logan (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 13 ) and this action are dismissed for failure to state a claim, and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. The Clerk of Court must make an entry on the docket stating that the dismi ssal for failure to state a claim may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The docket shall reflect that the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) and Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(3)(A), that any appeal of this decision would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/28/2013. (KMG)
April 4, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's "Notice Judicial" is denied to the extent that any relief is sought therein 11 . Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/4/13. (TLJ)
March 15, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff's motion for extension of time 9 is granted to the extent as set forth in thi sorder; Plaintiff has 30 days from the filing date of this Order to file a second amended complaint in compliance with the 2/11/13 Order 8 ; if Pla intiff fails to file a second amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/14/13. (REW)
February 11, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The First Amended Complaint (Doc. 7 ) is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a second amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file a second am ended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 2/8/2013. (KMG)
November 7, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Jose Carrera Beltran. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/6/12. (REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beltran v. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Carrera Beltran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?