Newell v. Ryan et al

Petitioner: Steven Ray Newell
Respondent: Charles L Ryan and Ron Credio
Case Number: 2:2012cv02038
Filed: September 26, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2017 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 76 Newell's motion for supplemental briefing. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/2/17.(LSP)
October 20, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED denying Newell's Motion for Temporary Stay and Abeyance and to Legally Represent Petitioner in State Court Proceedings. (Doc. 72 .) Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/20/2016. (REK)
August 24, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 67 Petitioner's Motion to Supplement. Respondents shall file a response to Petitioner's supplemental brief no later than September 6, 2016. Petitioner shall file a reply no later than September 16, 2016. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/24/16.(LSP)
September 9, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 56 Petitioner's motion for evidentiary development. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/9/15.(LSP)
August 19, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 39 Petitioner's Motion to Remand to Maricopa County Superior Court for Reconstruction of the Record and denying Motion to Stay until Reconstruction of the Record is Complete. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/13.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newell v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Ray Newell
Represented By: Dale A Baich
Represented By: Jon M Sands
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ron Credio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?