Bunn v. Ryan et al

Petitioner: Otis Eugene Bunn
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona and Charles L Ryan
Case Number: 2:2012cv02114
Filed: October 5, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 27, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Magistrate Judge Anderson's R & R 20 is ACCEPTED. Petitioner's Motion to Compel is 27 is DENIED as moot. Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 is DENIED AND DISMISSED WITH PRE JUDICE. The Clerk of Court shall TERMINATE this action and enter judgment accordingly. Pursuant to Rule 11(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, in the event Petitioner files an appeal, the Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/27/2014. (ALS)
October 17, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Petitioner's Motion for Evidentiary Hearing and Oral Argument. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/17/13.(TLJ)
November 9, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Petitioner's Application/Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Granting in part 4 Petitioner's Motion to Submit Exhibits, to the extent Petitioner is seeking permission to file the unfiled exhibits to which he refers in his Petition and is denied in part as premature to the extent Petitioner is requesting an evidentiary hearing. The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the Petition (Doc. 1) and this Order on the Respondent and the Attorney General of the State of Arizona by certified mail. Respondents must answer the Petition within 40 days of the date of service. Petitioner may file a reply within 30 days from the date of service of the answer. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Lawrence O. Anderson for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/9/12.(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bunn v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Otis Eugene Bunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?