Dehar v. Knight

Plaintiff: Donald Cory Dehar
Defendant: David Knight
Case Number: 2:2012cv02190
Filed: October 12, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 11 Statement filed by Donald Cory Dehar. ORDERED that to the extent that plaintiff seeks any relief in his filing of 10/15/2013 (Doc. 11), such relief is denied. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/28/2013. (Copy mailed to Donald C. Dehar on 10/28/2013).(TLB)
December 10, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting Plaintiff's 8 Motion for Extension of Time; Plaintiff is granted an additional 30 days from the filing date of this Order within which to comply with the Order filed on 11/2/12 6 , by either paying the $350.00 filing fee or filing a completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement; if Plaintiff fails to comply with this order, the Clerk must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff; if Plaintiff is unable to fully comply with the 11/2/12 Order due to acts or omissions of others beyond his control, Plaintiff must file a declaration signed under penalty of perjury setting forth facts to support any inability to comply no later than 30 days from the filing date of this Order. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 12/10/12. (REW)
November 2, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, within 30 days, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement; if Plaintiff fails to comply with this order, the Clerk must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/1/12.(REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dehar v. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Cory Dehar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?