Federal Trade Commission v. ELH Consulting LLC, et al

Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: ELH Consulting LLC, Purchase Power Solutions LLC, Allied Corporate Connection LLC, Complete Financial Strategies LLC, 3Point14 Consultants LLC, Justin Journay, Key Tech Software Solutions LLC, Emory L Holley, IV, Lisa Miller and Rares Stelea
Receiver: Peter S Davis
Case Number: 2:2012cv02246
Filed: October 22, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2013 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 120 Motion to Continue Deadline for Filing Summary Judgment filed by Federal Trade Commission. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall file a Supplemental Memorandum in support of its motion answering the questions listed in the attached Order, no later than October 8, 2013. (See attached PDF for details). Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/3/13. (JAMA)
September 4, 2013 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the 94 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/4/2013.(LFIG)
February 7, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Accordingly, it is ORDERED GRANTING plaintiff's application for preliminary injunctive relief. Counsel for plaintiff shall lodge with the court an updated proposed form of preliminary injunction which is consistent with the TRO and thi s order by February 15, 2013. The defendant may stipulate to the form, absent which, defendant may file objections to the form no later than 10 days after the lodging of the proposed preliminary injunction. This order constitutes the court's findings and conclusions under Rule 52(a) (2), Fed. R. Civ. P. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 2/6/13. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. ELH Consulting LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Peter S Davis
Represented By: Ryan W Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Laura M Solis
Represented By: Eleanor Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELH Consulting LLC
Represented By: Kurt A Goering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purchase Power Solutions LLC
Represented By: Kurt A Goering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Corporate Connection LLC
Represented By: Kurt A Goering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Complete Financial Strategies LLC
Represented By: Kurt A Goering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3Point14 Consultants LLC
Represented By: Hank T Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Journay
Represented By: Hank T Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key Tech Software Solutions LLC
Represented By: Hank T Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emory L Holley, IV
Represented By: Kurt A Goering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Miller
Represented By: Kurt A Goering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rares Stelea
Represented By: Hank T Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?