Barrera v. US Airways Group Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Baltazar Eduardo Barrera
Defendant: US Airways Group Incorporated and US Airways Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2012cv02278
Filed: October 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Bridget S Bade
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER that the #69 Motion for Approval of Collective Action Settlement Agreement and Dismissal with Prejudice is GRANTED. ORDERED that Plaintiffs' #73 Motion for Approval of Attorney's Fees is GRANTED and that Court awards Plaintiffs $7,143.42 in attorneys' fees and $2,637.70 in costs to be paid in the manner specified in the Settlement Agreement. The June 25, 2014 Approval Hearing is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear its fees and costs, except as otherwise provided in this Order and in the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 5/23/2014. (LFIG)
May 23, 2014 Filing 74 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #73 MOTION for Attorney Fees Statement of Costs by Plaintiff Baltazar Eduardo Barrera. (Dayes, Trey)
May 21, 2014 Filing 73 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Trey Dayes, #2 Exhibit Time Sheet for Matter, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Dayes, Trey)
May 21, 2014 Filing 72 *NOTICE re: NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFFS CONSENTS TO SETTLEMENT AND MOTION TO VACATE APPROVAL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 25, 2014 by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Consent Baltazar Barrera, Lowell Dean, Heather Hochstedler, Susan Jovanovic, and Donald Vitale)(Dayes, Trey) *Modified to add motion type on 5/21/2014 (LSP).
May 14, 2014 Filing 71 IT IS ORDERED the Approval Hearing presently set for 6/25/14 at 9:30 AM is RESET AS TO COURTROOM LOCATION ONLY. Approval Hearing set for 6/25/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 304, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Bridget S. Bade. (BSB, ew)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER that #69 Plaintiff's MOTION for Approval Collective Action Settlement Agreement and Dismissal with Prejudice is held in abeyance. An Approval Hearing is set for 6/25/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before May 23, 2014 Plaintiffs' counsel must file a motion addressing the reasonableness of the attorneys' fees requested in the Settlement Agreement. See PDF document for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 5/8/14. (LSP)
April 18, 2014 Filing 69 MOTION Approve Settlement Agreement by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit JOINT STIPULATION OF COLLECTIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE AGREEMENT, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit C)(Dayes, Trey)
February 18, 2014 Filing 68 NOTICE of Settlement by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera. (Dayes, Trey)
December 12, 2013 Filing 67 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by US Airways Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent American Airlines Group, Inc., Other Affiliate US Airways Group, Inc. for US Airways Incorporated.. (Siegel, Robert) *Document filed in wrong case. Attorney re-filed document in correct case on 12/12/2013 (LSP).
December 12, 2013 Filing 66 Corporate Disclosure Statement by US Airways Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent American Airlines Group, Inc., Other Affiliate US Airways Group, Inc. for US Airways Incorporated.. (Siegel, Robert)
October 14, 2013 Filing 65 NOTICE re Consent to Opt-In to Lawsuit and be a Party Plaintiff as Required by 29 U.S.C. 216(b) for Opt-In Plaintiff Larry Phillips by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opt-In Form of Larry Phillips)(Dayes, Trey)
October 10, 2013 Filing 64 NOTICE re Consent to Opt-In to Lawsuit and be a Party Plaintiff as Required by 29 U.S.C. 216(b) for Opt-In Plaintiff Lowell Dean by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opt-In Form of Lowell Dean)(Dayes, Trey)
October 5, 2013 Filing 63 NOTICE re Consent to Opt-In to Lawsuit and be a Party Plaintiff as Required by 29 U.S.C. 216(b) for Opt-In Plaintiff Heather Hochstedler by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opt-In Form of Heather Hochstedler)(Dayes, Trey)
September 30, 2013 Filing 62 NOTICE re Notice of Mailing by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera . (Dayes, Trey)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery IS due by 2/14/2014 and Dispositive motions are due by 5/15/2014. See PDF document for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 9/24/13. (LSP)
September 20, 2013 Filing 60 NOTICE re Revised Proposed Notice and Consent Form re Potential Collective Action Claim Under The Fair Labor Standards Act by US Airways Incorporated re #55 Order on Motion to Certify Class,,, . (Weinstein, Jillian)
September 20, 2013 Filing 59 NOTICE re Proposed Amended Joint Case Management Plan by US Airways Incorporated re #55 Order on Motion to Certify Class,,, . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weinstein, Jillian)
September 9, 2013 Filing 58 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera. (Dayes, Trey)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Stipulated Protective Order regarding Cofidential Documents and Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 9/6/13.(LSP)
September 6, 2013 Filing 56 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Confidential Documents And Information by US Airways Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weinstein, Jillian)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER that Plaintiff's #39 Motion to Conditionally Certify a Collective Action is GRANTED. On or before September 20, 2013, the parties shall jointly file a revised proposed notice and a revised consent form that comply with this Order and a jointly proposed method of providing notice to the potential class members. ORDERED that by September 13, 2013, Defendant must provide Plaintiff's counsel with an electronic, importable list of the names and last known mailing addresses of all current and former security guards who worked for U.S. Airways, Inc. at any time between October 24, 2009 and the present. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by September 20, 2013, the parties shall file an Amended Joint Case Management Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 8/30/2013. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)
August 9, 2013 Filing 54 NOTICE re Service of Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera DOCKET 53 Entered in Error. (Dayes, Trey)
August 9, 2013 Filing 53 *NOTICE re Service of Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera . (Dayes, Trey) *Document filed in error, attorney re-filed corrected document on 8/09/2013 (LSP).
August 2, 2013 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 MOTION to Certify Class Motion for Preliminary Collective Action Certification and Court Supervised Notice of Pending Collective Action filed by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Baltazar Barrera, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Susan S. Jovanovic, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Donald Vitale)(Dayes, Trey)
August 1, 2013 Filing 51 NOTICE re Service of Responses to Defendant's Request for Production by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera . (Dayes, Trey)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER upon #49 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply; Plaintiff's due date to file a reply in support of his motion for conditional certification is extended until August 2nd, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 7/23/13.(LSP)
July 23, 2013 Filing 49 *MOTION for Extension of Due Date for Plaintiff to File Reply in Support of Motion for Conditional Certification Stipulated by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dayes, Trey) *Modified to correct motion type on 7/23/2013 (LSP).
July 12, 2013 Filing 48 OBJECTION re #39 MOTION to Certify Class Motion for Preliminary Collective Action Certification and Court Supervised Notice of Pending Collective Action /Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Donald Vitale Jr. in Support of Motion by Defendant US Airways Incorporated. (McGuinness, Michael)
July 12, 2013 Filing 47 OBJECTION re #39 MOTION to Certify Class Motion for Preliminary Collective Action Certification and Court Supervised Notice of Pending Collective Action /Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Susan Jovanovic in Support of Motion by Defendant US Airways Incorporated. (McGuinness, Michael)
July 12, 2013 Filing 46 OBJECTION re #39 MOTION to Certify Class Motion for Preliminary Collective Action Certification and Court Supervised Notice of Pending Collective Action /Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Baltazar Barrera in Support of Motion by Defendant US Airways Incorporated. (McGuinness, Michael)
July 12, 2013 Filing 45 OBJECTION re #39 MOTION to Certify Class Motion for Preliminary Collective Action Certification and Court Supervised Notice of Pending Collective Action /Objections and Response to Proposed Class Notice and Consent Form by Defendant US Airways Incorporated. (McGuinness, Michael)
July 12, 2013 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 MOTION to Certify Class Motion for Preliminary Collective Action Certification and Court Supervised Notice of Pending Collective Action filed by US Airways Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Compendium number 1 in Support of Opposition, #2 Compendium number 2 in Support of Opposition)(McGuinness, Michael)
July 1, 2013 Filing 43 NOTICE re US Airways, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures by US Airways Incorporated re #40 Order, . (Weinstein, Jillian)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting the #41 Motion and Defendant US Airways, Inc., shall have up to twenty-five pages, to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Collective Action Certification and Court Supervised Notice of Pending Collective Action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 7/1/2013.(LFIG)
June 28, 2013 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Collective Action Certification /Unopposed Motion by US Airways Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McGuinness, Michael)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED by (Doc. #61 ) SCHEDULING ORDER - Plaintiff shall file a motion for preliminary or conditional class certification of this matter as a collective action by June 21, 2013. Defendant shall file its response in opposition to that motion by July 12, 2013. Plaintiff shall file any reply by July 26, 2013. See PDF document for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 6/17/13. (LSP) Modified on 9/24/2013 (LSP).
June 17, 2013 Filing 39 MOTION to Certify Class Motion for Preliminary Collective Action Certification and Court Supervised Notice of Pending Collective Action by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Right to Opt-In to Lawsuit-Exhibit 1 to Conditional Certification Motion, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Baltazar Barrera, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Susan Jovanovic, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Donald Vitale Jr.)(Dayes, Trey)
June 17, 2013 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade: Scheduling Conference held on 6/17/2013. Discussion held. Briefing Schedule ORDER to issue regarding Plaintiffs Motion for Conditional Class Certification. The parties may conduct discovery while this motion is pending. After ruling upon the Motion for Conditional Class Certification, the Court will set another Rule 16 Scheduling Conference to determine the remaining deadlines for the case management order. APPEARANCES: Trey A. R. Dayes, III for Plaintiff. Karen Gillen, U.S. Airways for Defendant and telephonic appearance by attorney Michael McGuinnes, OMelveny & Myers LLP, for Defendant. (Recorded by COURTSMART.) Hearing held 9:37 AM to 9:58 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (PKD)
May 30, 2013 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera PLAINTIFFS' INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Dayes, Trey)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER setting Rule 16 Case Management Conference for 6/17/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 5/22/13. (LSP)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Minute Order: Pursuant to [34 ] Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge signed by Chief Judge Roslyn O. Silver, this case is hereby reassigned to Magistrate Judge Bridget S. Bade. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-12-2278-PHX-BSB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 16, 2013 Filing 34 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TRIAL. Signed by Chief Judge Roslyn O Silver on 5/16/13. (MAP)
May 16, 2013 Filing 33 TEXT ONLY Minute Order: The Scheduling Conference set for May 16,2013 at 10:30 AM before Chief Judge Silver is VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CLB)
May 6, 2013 Filing 32 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dayes, Trey)
April 23, 2013 Filing 31 NOTICE re Change of Firm by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera . (Dayes, Trey)
April 23, 2013 Filing 30 NOTICE re Consent to Opt-In to Lawsuit and be a Party Plaintiff as Required by 29 U.S.C. 216(b) for Opt-In Plaintiff Susan S. Jovanovic by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Opt-In Form)(Dayes, Trey)
April 23, 2013 Filing 29 *NOTICE re Consent to Opt-In to Lawsuit and be a Party Plaintiff as Required by 29 U.S.C. 216(b) for Opt-In Plaintiff Susan S. Jovanovic by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera. (Dayes, Trey) *Document filed in error, attorney re-filed with correct PDF document at (Doc. 31) on 4/24/2013 (LSP).
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #27 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
April 19, 2013 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX133160 as to Jillian R Weinstein. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 18, 2013 Filing 27 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jillian R. Weinstein by US Airways Group Incorporated, US Airways Incorporated. (Weinstein, Jillian)
April 12, 2013 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by US Airways Group Incorporated, US Airways Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McGuinness, Michael)
April 11, 2013 Filing 25 STIPULATION of Dismissal pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by US Airways Group Incorporated, US Airways Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McGuinness, Michael)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants US Airways Group, Inc., and US Airways, Inc., shall have to and including April 12, 2013, to answer the Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Roslyn O Silver on 4/3/13.(CLB)
April 1, 2013 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint / Stipulated Motion To Extend Time For Defendants To File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by US Airways Group Incorporated, US Airways Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Attachment To Stipulated Motion To Extend Time, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(McGuinness, Michael)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. (FRCP) 16 a Scheduling Conference is set for May 16, 2013 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 604 at the Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Courthouse, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED at the case management meeting the counsel/parties shall prepare a Proposed Case Management Plan and a Proposed Scheduling Order and shall file them with the Court not less than ten days before the Scheduling Conference. Signed by Chief Judge Roslyn O Silver on 3/19/13. (CLB)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying Defendants' #16 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Roslyn O Silver on 3/18/13.(CLB)
January 21, 2013 Filing 20 NOTICE re Filing of Consent to Opt-Into Collective Action by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera re Susan S. Jovanovic. (Dayes, Trey)
December 20, 2012 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by US Airways Group Incorporated, US Airways Incorporated. (Siegel, Robert)
December 10, 2012 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Plaintiffs' Paystubs Showing Overtime Sometimes Paid)(Dayes, Trey)
November 21, 2012 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by US Airways Group Incorporated, US Airways Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McGuinness, Michael)
November 21, 2012 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by US Airways Group Incorporated, US Airways Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McGuinness, Michael)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
November 21, 2012 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX128298 as to Michael G McGuinness. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 19, 2012 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Michael G. McGuinness by US Airways Incorporated. (McGuinness, Michael)
November 19, 2012 Filing 13 * Minute Order: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.8(a), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Chief Judge Roslyn O. Silver. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-12-2278-PHX-ROS. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for December 6, 2012 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)* Modified to correct date of hearing which was vacated on 11/20/2012 (LAD).
November 16, 2012 Filing 12 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
November 16, 2012 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX128246 as to Robert Alan Siegel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 15, 2012 Filing 10 Magistrate Election Form Deadline set as to US Airways (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Ordered that Baltazar Eduardo Barrera show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.8(a) before Chief Judge Roslyn O Silver. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/6/2012 at 04:00 PM before Chief Judge Roslyn O Silver. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
November 15, 2012 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Robert Siegel by US Airways Incorporated. (Siegel, Robert)
November 9, 2012 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera. US Airways Incorporated served on 10/31/2012. (Dayes, Trey)
November 9, 2012 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera. US Airways Group Incorporated served on 10/31/2012. (Dayes, Trey)
November 9, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE re Filing of Consent to Opt-Into Collective Action by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera re Donald Vitale, Jr.. (Dayes, Trey)
October 25, 2012 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to US Airways Group Incorporated, US Airways Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 24, 2012 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX 0970-7380325. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bridget S. Bade. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-12-02278-PHX-BSB. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(REK)
October 24, 2012 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera (submitted by Trey Dayes). (Attachments: #1 Summons)(REK)
October 24, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $350.00, receipt number PHX 0970-7380325, filed by Baltazar Eduardo Barrera (submitted by Trey Dayes). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrera v. US Airways Group Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baltazar Eduardo Barrera
Represented By: Trey A R Dayes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Airways Group Incorporated
Represented By: Karen Gillen
Represented By: Michael G McGuinness
Represented By: Robert Alan Siegel
Represented By: Jillian R Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Airways Incorporated
Represented By: Karen Gillen
Represented By: Michael G McGuinness
Represented By: Robert Alan Siegel
Represented By: Jillian R Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?