Jones-Rankins v. Cardinal Health Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Weltha J Jones-Rankins
Defendant: Valerie Pitteroff, Ryan McGraw, Steven B Merkin, Elizabeth Brown, Lisa Marling-George, Robert S Randklev, Cardinal Health Incorporated, Brian K Merrill and Johnni Beckel
Case Number: 2:2012cv02360
Filed: November 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2014 Filing 39 MANDATE of USCA granting the motion to reinstate appeal and affirming the district court's judgment re: #32 Notice of Appeal filed by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 NDA)(LAD) (Distributed by the Ninth Circuit)
March 26, 2014 Filing 38 USCA Appeal Fees received re: 13-16486 #32 Notice of Appeal filed by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. Filing Fee $455, receipt number PHX 144409. (REW)
January 10, 2014 Filing 37 MANDATE of USCA dismissing the appeal for failure to prosecute re: 13-16486 #32 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 NDA)(Copies sent by Ninth Circuit)(ALS)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER of USCA, appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis denied, within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay the $455.00 filing fee to the District Court and file proof of payment with this court, if appellant fails to comply the appeal will be dismissed, re: 13-16486 as to #32 Notice of Appeal filed by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (Copies sent by the Ninth Circuit). (LSP)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER, Plaintiff's IFP Status is revoked, the Clerk shall promptly transmit this order to the Ninth Circuit, noting appellate case number re: 13-16486 #34 USCA Order, #32 Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/25/13. (REW)
July 24, 2013 Filing 34 REFERRAL NOTICE of USCA, pursuant to 28:1915, this matter is referred to District Court for the limited purpose of determining whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal or whether the appeal is frivolous or taken in bad faith, re: 13-16486, as to #32 Notice of Appeal filed by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (Copies sent by the Ninth Circuit). (LSP)
July 23, 2013 Filing 33 Ninth Circuit Case Number 13-16486 for #32 Notice of Appeal. (Copies sent by the Ninth Circuit). (LSP)
July 19, 2013 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit, as to #31 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #28 Order, by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (REW)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying #30 Motion for Reconsideration (see order for details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/20/2013.(TCA)
June 13, 2013 Filing 30 MOTION for Reconsideration re #28 Order Dismissing Lawsuit by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (REW)
June 13, 2013 Filing 29 *MEMORANDUM in Support of #29 MOTION for Reconsideration re #28 Order Dismissing Lawsuit by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (REW) *Modified from Motion (filed separately) on 6/14/2013* (REW).
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER, Defendants' motion to dismiss #16 is granted; the amended complaint #6 is dismissed with prejudice; Defendants' motion to reassign the case to Judge Martone #14 is denied as moot; Defendants' motion to stay or dismiss this lawsuit until Plaintiff has paid the bill of costs from her last lawsuit #15 is denied as moot; the Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/28/13.(REW)
May 6, 2013 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Stay or Dismiss this Lawsuit Until Plaintiff Has Paid The Bill of Costs From Her Last Lawsuit filed by Johnni Beckel, Elizabeth Brown, Cardinal Health Incorporated, Lisa Marling-George, Ryan McGraw, Steven B Merkin, Brian K Merrill, Valerie Pitteroff, Robert S Randklev. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unreported Case: Balla v. Idaho State Board of Correction, #2 Exhibit Unreported Case: Seto v. Kama'Aina Care Incorporated, #3 Exhibit Unreported Case: Seto v. Thielen)(Lebowitz, Todd)
May 6, 2013 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Johnni Beckel, Elizabeth Brown, Cardinal Health Incorporated, Lisa Marling-George, Ryan McGraw, Steven B Merkin, Brian K Merrill, Valerie Pitteroff, Robert S Randklev. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Unreported Cases)(Lebowitz, Todd)
May 6, 2013 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Reassign Case to Judge Martone filed by Johnni Beckel, Elizabeth Brown, Cardinal Health Incorporated, Lisa Marling-George, Ryan McGraw, Steven B Merkin, Brian K Merrill, Valerie Pitteroff, Robert S Randklev. (Lebowitz, Todd)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Setting Rule 16 Case Management Conference for 6/19/2013 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell (see order for complete details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/30/13. (REW)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #19 Motion for Extension of Time; Plaintiff shall file her Responses to Defendants' #14 MOTION to Transfer, #15 MOTION to Stay, #16 MOTION to Dismiss by 4/26/13. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/30/13.(REW)
April 26, 2013 Filing 22 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits - part 1, #2 Exhibits - part 2)(REW)
April 26, 2013 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Stay filed by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (REW)
April 26, 2013 Filing 20 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Reassign Case to Judge Martone filed by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (REW)
April 26, 2013 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Reassign/Transfer, #15 MOTION to Stay, #16 MOTION to Dismiss, by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (REW)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses; Plaintiff shall file her Responses to Defendants' Motions by 4/25/13 re: #14 Motion to Transfer, #15 Motion to Stay, #16 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/22/13.(REW)
April 17, 2013 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #14 MOTION to Reassign/Transfer Case to Judge Martone, #15 MOTION to Stay, #16 MOTION to Dismiss, by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (REW)
April 1, 2013 Filing 16 *MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Johnni Beckel, Elizabeth Brown, Cardinal Health Incorporated, Lisa Marling-George, Ryan McGraw, Steven B Merkin, Brian K Merrill, Valerie Pitteroff, Robert S Randklev. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 - Jones-Rankins Bankruptcy Petition, #3 Exhibit 2 - Amended Schedule, #4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Lebowitz, #5 Exhibit 4 - Trustee's Final Report, #6 Exhibit 5 - Bankruptcy Court History, #7 Exhibit 6 - English v. Santa Anita Race Track, #8 Exhibit 7 - Jones-Rankins Declaration in Bankruptcy Court, #9 Exhibit 8 - Westlaw's California codes Currentness)(Lebowitz, Todd) *Modified to correct Motion event on 4/2/2013* (REW).
April 1, 2013 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay or Dismiss this Lawsuit Until Plaintiff Has Paid The Bill of Costs From Her Last Lawsuit by Johnni Beckel, Elizabeth Brown, Cardinal Health Incorporated, Lisa Marling-George, Ryan McGraw, Steven B Merkin, Brian K Merrill, Valerie Pitteroff, Robert S Randklev. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit 1 - Complaint Jones-Rankins I, #4 Exhibit 2 - Jones-Rankins I Judgement Docket #89, #5 Exhibit 3 - Holden v. Illinois Tool Works, Inc. Case Citations)(Lebowitz, Todd)
April 1, 2013 Filing 14 MOTION to Reassign Case to Judge Martone by Johnni Beckel, Elizabeth Brown, Cardinal Health Incorporated, Lisa Marling-George, Ryan McGraw, Steven B Merkin, Brian K Merrill, Valerie Pitteroff, Robert S Randklev. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Reassign This Related Case to Judge Martone, #2 Exhibit 1 Complaint Jones-Rankins I, #3 Exhibit 2 - Smith v. Sperling, et al.)(Lebowitz, Todd)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
March 25, 2013 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Gilbert P Brosky on behalf of defendants Johnni Beckel, Elizabeth Brown, Cardinal Health Incorporated, Lisa Marling-George, Ryan McGraw, Steven B Merkin, Brian K Merrill, Valerie Pitteroff, and Robert S Randklev. (BAS)
March 25, 2013 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Todd H Lebowitz on behalf of defendants Johnni Beckel, Elizabeth Brown, Cardinal Health Incorporated, Lisa Marling-George, Ryan McGraw, Steven B Merkin, Brian K Merrill, Valerie Pitteroff, and Robert S Randklev. (BAS)
March 25, 2013 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX132391 as to Todd H Lebowitz. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 25, 2013 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX132390 as to Gilbert P Brosky. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 6, 2013 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed All Defendants. (BAH)
March 5, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James Burr Shields, II on behalf of Johnni Beckel, Elizabeth Brown, Cardinal Health Incorporated, Lisa Marling-George, Ryan McGraw, Steven B Merkin, Brian K Merrill, Valerie Pitteroff, Robert S Randklev. (Shields, James)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #7 Motion for Extension of Time for Service; Plaintiff shall complete service on the remaining Defendants on or before 4/5/13. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/13.(REW)
February 20, 2013 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Summons and Complaint by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (REW)
February 1, 2013 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cardinal Health Incorporated, Brian K. Merrill, Robert S. Randklev, Valerie Pitteroff, Lisa Marling-George, Johnni Beckel, Steven B. Merkin, Elizabeth Brown, and Ryan McGraw, filed by Weltha J. Jones-Rankins.(BAH)
February 1, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing First Amended Complaint by Weltha J. Jones-Rankins (Note: Strike-out/Red-line version of amended complaint attached.) (BAH)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/6/12.(TLJ)
November 5, 2012 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-12-02360-PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MHU)
November 5, 2012 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (MHU)
November 5, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Weltha J Jones-Rankins.(MHU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones-Rankins v. Cardinal Health Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Pitteroff
Represented By: Gilbert P Brosky
Represented By: Todd H Lebowitz
Represented By: James Burr Shields, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan McGraw
Represented By: Gilbert P Brosky
Represented By: Todd H Lebowitz
Represented By: James Burr Shields, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven B Merkin
Represented By: Gilbert P Brosky
Represented By: Todd H Lebowitz
Represented By: James Burr Shields, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Brown
Represented By: Gilbert P Brosky
Represented By: Todd H Lebowitz
Represented By: James Burr Shields, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Marling-George
Represented By: Gilbert P Brosky
Represented By: Todd H Lebowitz
Represented By: James Burr Shields, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S Randklev
Represented By: Gilbert P Brosky
Represented By: Todd H Lebowitz
Represented By: James Burr Shields, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Incorporated
Represented By: Gilbert P Brosky
Represented By: Todd H Lebowitz
Represented By: James Burr Shields, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian K Merrill
Represented By: Gilbert P Brosky
Represented By: Todd H Lebowitz
Represented By: James Burr Shields, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnni Beckel
Represented By: Gilbert P Brosky
Represented By: Todd H Lebowitz
Represented By: James Burr Shields, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weltha J Jones-Rankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?