Jolley v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Tamra Jolley
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Case Number: 2:2012cv02447
Filed: November 14, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Attorney's Motion for an Award of Attorney Fees under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) (Doc. 40 ) is GRANTED in the amount of $31,096.50. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's counsel must refund the lesser of the EAJA fee award and the § 406(b) fee award to Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/5/2016. (KAL)
March 25, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's 17 Motion to Remand is granted pursuant to sentence 4 of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g); this case is remanded to the agency and the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/25/2014.(LFIG)
December 19, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - ORDERED that Defendant shall file a reply to 17 Motion to Remand to Social Security Administration within fourteen (14) days. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a sur-reply within 28 days. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 12/19/2013. (TLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jolley v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamra Jolley
Represented By: Eric Glenn Slepian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?