Fernandez et al v. Virgillo et al

Plaintiff: Elvira Fernandez and Frank Rodriquez
Defendant: Sergio Virgillo and Maria Virgillo
Case Number: 2:2012cv02475
Filed: November 16, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Mark E Aspey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court *ORDER and OPINION granting 63 Virgillo's Motion for Summary Judgment. The case is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 6/27/2014. (See Order for details)(ALS) *Modified to add omitted text on 6/30/2014 (ALS).
March 4, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION denying 46 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Qualified Immunity. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 3/3/2014.(ALS)
February 15, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 2/15/13.(JWS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez et al v. Virgillo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Virgillo
Represented By: Kathleen L Wieneke
Represented By: Christina Gail Retts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Virgillo
Represented By: Kathleen L Wieneke
Represented By: Christina Gail Retts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvira Fernandez
Represented By: Lawrence J Wulkan
Represented By: Sabinus A Megwa
Represented By: Michael C Manning
Represented By: Jennifer Linda Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Rodriquez
Represented By: Michael C Manning
Represented By: Jennifer Linda Allen
Represented By: Sabinus A Megwa
Represented By: Lawrence J Wulkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?