Chapa v. Arpaio et al

Plaintiff: Ralph John Chapa
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio, Unknown Party, Maricopa County Board of Supervisors, Unknown Parties, Unknown Beddome, Unknown Campanero, John McCain, Unknown Sanchez, C J Beddome, Fulton Brock, Don Stapley, Max Wilson, Mary Rose Wilcox and Janice K Brewer
Case Number: 2:2012cv02482
Filed: November 16, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: David K Duncan (PS)
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure this action is dismissed without prejudice and the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/2/2014. (KMG)
April 16, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court finds, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that Plaintiff's interlocutory appeal 20 is not taken in good faith. The Clerk of Court must forward a copy of this order to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/16/2013. (KMG)
March 5, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn only with respect to Plaintiff's "Motion for Reconsideration of Court[']s Order... or in the Alternative [to] Give Mr. Chapa Permission to Appeal" (Doc. 14 ); all other mat ters must remain with the Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff's February 25, 2013 "Motion for Reconsideration of Court[']s Order... or in the Alternative Give Mr. Chapa Permission to Appeal" (Doc. 14) is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/5/2013.(KMG)
February 7, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet): ORDERED Plaintiff's 2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is granted. Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee. Defendants Maricopa County Board of Supervisors, Brock, Stapley, Wilson, Wilcox, Brewer, Bedd ome, Sergeant Beddome, Campanaro, McCain, Sanchez, Unknown Lieutenant, Sergeant A5105, and MCSO Maintenance Supervisors are dismissed without prejudice. Defendant Arpaio must answer the Complaint. Plaintiff's 4 , 5 and 7 Motions are denied. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the 1 Complaint, this Order and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendant Arpaio. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/7/13. (LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapa v. Arpaio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph John Chapa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Beddome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Campanero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McCain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C J Beddome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulton Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Stapley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Rose Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice K Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?