Acushnet Company v. Thiede, et al.
Plaintiff: Acushnet Company
Defendant: Unknown Parties, Thomas Allan Thiede and Dualwin Sporting Goods Compay Limited
Case Number: 2:2012cv02508
Filed: November 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 51 Plaintiff's Motion to Release/Exonerate Bond. The bond posted on December 6, 2012 is exonerated. The Clerk shall issue a check payable to Osborn Maledon for the $10,000 bond, including all accrued interest. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/3/14.(LSP)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 40 Plaintiff's Application for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendant Dualwin Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/27/13.(MAW)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 SEALED ORDER granting Application for Preliminary Injunction FURTHER ORDERED denying 32 Sealed Motion. Instead, the seal on the entirety of this case is hereby removed, and the Clerk is instructed to return this file to the public portion of the Court records. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 1/8/13. (cc: Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant) (MAP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acushnet Company v. Thiede, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Allan Thiede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dualwin Sporting Goods Compay Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acushnet Company
Represented By: Stephen M Gaffigan
Represented By: R Douglas Dalton
Represented By: John Laxson Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?