Little v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Peter James Little
Defendant: Safety Sam Incorporated, Cheryl Dossett, R W Stevwing, Charles L Ryan, Unknown Radecki, Devon Dickinson, Aurora Aguilar and Unknown Yanez
Case Number: 2:2012cv02512
Filed: November 26, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Yuma
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 63 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and denying as moot 64 Plaintiff's Motion to Enhance Page Limits for First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 2/20/14.(LSP)
November 15, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 39 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot 40 Plaintiff's Motion to Enhance Page Limits for First Amended Complaint and 47 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time or Stay of Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/15/2013.(TLB)
September 3, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, doc. 25 , is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Enhance Page Limits for First Amended Complaint, doc. 26 , is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for the Appointment of Counsel, doc. 27 , is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/3/2013.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety Sam Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Dossett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R W Stevwing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Radecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Yanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter James Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?