Smalley v. Contino et al

Plaintiff: Blake Smalley
Defendant: Unknown Party, Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office, Maricopa, County of and C Contino
Case Number: 2:2012cv02524
Filed: November 26, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2014 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re in camera review. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/6/2014. (DGC, nvo)
February 5, 2014 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 108 Motion re in camera review and protective order; denying 108 Motion for Protective Order. The County shall produce any responsive executive session minutes within seven dys of this order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/5/2014.(DGC, nvo)
December 12, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 89 Memorandum filed by Maricopa, County of, Joseph M Arpaio, 90 First MOTION to Produce E Minutes Lynn Pucino filed by Blake Smalley. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/12/2013. (DGC, nvo)
October 18, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 59 Memorandum filed by Blake Smalley, 60 Memorandum filed by Maricopa, County of, Joseph M Arpaio, Christopher M Contino, Herbert Rowe. Defendants shall produce Christopher Contino's Investigative Affairs Report in connection with the 9/22/2012 incident on or before 10/25/2013. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/18/2013. (DGC, nvo)
March 7, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 10 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/7/2013.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smalley v. Contino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Represented By: James W Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Represented By: James W Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: James W Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa, County of
Represented By: James W Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Contino
Represented By: James W Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Smalley
Represented By: Robert Evan Trop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?