Amrani v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Jacob Amrani
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2012cv02583
Filed: December 4, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2015 256 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 249 Objection to Witness List. The motion at docket 249 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: The United States' stipulation to the admission of Exhibit 174 is rescinded, and Exhibit 174 is no longer admitted into evid ence. Rulings on the United States' objections to Dr. Yablon's testimony are set out in this order. The testimony of Sharon Helman is excluded. Dr. Baker may not testify about the specific skills that spine surgeons must possess or how a spine surgeon's motor skills affect his or her practice. See PDF for entire text. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 2/5/15. (JWS)
January 14, 2015 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 222 Motion in Limine for an order precluding all standard of care and causation testimony from two defense witnesses, Dr. Sumit Dewanjee and Dr. Harold Dossett. See PDF document. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 1/14/15.(JWS)
January 6, 2015 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION granting in part and denying in part 97 Motion to Exclude or Limit Plaintiff's Experts Testimony and Opinions. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 1/6/15.(LAD)
December 10, 2014 213 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 187 Motion in Limine re: Character Evidence. The [internet] postings may not be introduced as evidence of the truth of their content. The postings may be introduced for the limited purpose of helping the court to evaluate Dr. Amrani's damage claim, provided that the United States first lays an adequate foundation. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 12/10/14.(JWS)
December 9, 2014 210 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 185 Motion in Limine. See PDF document. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 12/9/14.(JWS) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amrani v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Amrani
Represented By: David A Wenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?