Ramirez-Garcia v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Eduardo Ramirez-Garcia
Defendant: Charles L Ryan, Dennis Kendall, Unknown Wexford and Arizona Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2012cv02678
Filed: December 17, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's April 23, 2015 Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 22 ) is denied. Plaintiff must not file additional documents in this closed case, except in furtherance of an appeal. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/24/15.(KGM)
February 25, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 16 Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and this action are dismissed for failure to state a claim, and the Clerk must enter judgment. The Clerk must make an entry on the docket stating that the dismissal for failure to state a cla im may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The docket shall reflect that the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) and Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(3)(A), that any appeal of this decision would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 2/25/14. (LSP)
June 21, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Plaintiff's Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting 8 Plaintiff's Motion for Ruling/Status. The complaint (Doc. 1 ) is d ismissed with 30 days leave to amend. Clerk must enter dismissal with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) if plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/19/13.(LSP)
February 28, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is denied without prejudice. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. The Clerk must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Habeas). Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 2/28/2013. (LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez-Garcia v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Ramirez-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Wexford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?