Neuendorf #147980 v. St. Joseph's Hospital et al

Plaintiff: John Calvin Neuendorf, II
Defendant: David Oliver, Prison Corporations of America, Unknown Rivas, Fernando Ignatio, Charles L Ryan, William C Scibetta, James A Mankin, Edward M Reece, St. Joseph's Hospital, Joseph M Arpaio, Bette Jan Steinhillber, Michael S Walton, John C. Lincoln Hospital, Mariel Price, St. Luke's Hospital and Ron Steinhillber
Case Number: 2:2012cv02724
Filed: December 26, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: David K Duncan (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Payment of Inmate Filing Fee Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of John Calvin Neuendorf. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 5/2/2014. (See Order for details)(ALS)
December 13, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 27 is denied. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to either pay or file a complete Application within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice. Plaintiffs Motion to Amend/Correct 26 is granted. Plaintiff has 30 days from the filing date of this Order to file an amended complaint on the court-approved form. Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification 28 is granted to the extent that the Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a copy of the docket for this case. The Motion is denied with respect to all other relief requested. Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel 30 is denied. The Clerk of the Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved forms for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Habeas) and a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 12/12/2013. (ALS)
July 17, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, the Clerk must reopen this case. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In For ma Pauperis. Clerk must enter dismissal without prejudice if plaintiff fails to comply. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying 7 , 8 , 12 and 20 Plaintiff's Motion for Conditions of Relief and denying 9 , 13 , and 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. The Clerk must send a copy of this Order to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, re Ninth Circuit Case 13-16030. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 7/16/13.(LSP)
March 26, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's complaint 1 and this action are dismissed pursuant to 28:1915(g), without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a complaint in a new case accompanied by the full $350.00 filing fee. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment and close this case. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/26/13.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neuendorf #147980 v. St. Joseph's Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prison Corporations of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando Ignatio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William C Scibetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A Mankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward M Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph's Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bette Jan Steinhillber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Lincoln Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariel Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Luke's Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Steinhillber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Calvin Neuendorf, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?