Maloney v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Erik Scott Maloney
Defendant: Charles L Ryan, Wayne Mason, Mike Linderman, Lance Hetmer and Stephen Morris
Case Number: 2:2013cv00314
Filed: February 12, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Bridget S Bade (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The reference to the Magistrate is withdrawn as to the Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 45 ). The Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 45 ) is denied. All other matters must remain with the Magistrate for disposition as appropriate. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/28/2014.(ALS)
March 25, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc. 35). Defendants' 35 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants ha ve 30 days to file a motion to dismiss with proper evidence demonstrating that they have permanently changed the policy regarding breakfast time for Muslims during Ramadan. Plaintiff will have 30 days to file a response to any such motion, and Defe ndants are directed to file a reply to any response. The remaining claims are the claims for injunctive relief in Counts One andThree and the claims in Count Two. (See document for full details). Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/25/14.(LAD)
July 31, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying in all respects 16 Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 7/31/2013.(TLB)
July 23, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) Count IV of the Second Amended Complaint is dismissed. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet for defendants Ryan, Linderman, and Mason. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Bridget S. Bade. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 7/22/13. (TLJ)
July 16, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: 1) the defendants to file and serve a response to plaintiff's renewed motion for temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction (Doc. 16 ) by no later than Monday, July 22, 2013, at noon; (2) if plaintiff decides to file an d serve a reply, he shall do so by no later than Monday, July 29, 2013; and (3) plaintiff's motion shall be resolved on the written submissions before the court; no evidentiary hearing will be conducted. See Order for further details. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 7/16/13. (SJF)
June 28, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 9 Order filed June 20, 2013, requiring expedited briefing as to plaintiff's TRO motion is VACATED; the 12 Emergency Motion for Extended Time is DENIED as moot; Plaintiff's 8 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction is DENIED as moot; and Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file a second amended complaint, which shall be filed no later than twenty (20) days from the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/28/2013.(LFIG)
June 20, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on June 20, 2013, the Clerk of the Court shall send, by first class mail a copy of this Court's 5 , 6 Orders and a copy of plaintiff's 8 Motion for a TRO and/or PI, to defendants Ryan, Linderman, and Mason. The defendants shall file and serve a response to plaintiff's 8 Motion by no later than Wednesday, June 26, 2013. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/19/2013. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)
June 7, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Erik Scott Maloney. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/6/13. (MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maloney v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Linderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Hetmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Scott Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?