Miles v. Diaz et al

Plaintiff: Lawrence Wade Miles
Defendant: Terra Diaz, C Lewis, Unknown Nowling and Unknown King
Case Number: 2:2013cv00370
Filed: February 21, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2016 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Ms. Miles's Renewed Motion Regarding Substitution of Party (Doc. 176 ). FURTHER ORDERED substituting Elaine Miles as Plaintiff for the decedent, Lawrence Wade Miles, in this matter. FURTHER ORDERED granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc. 177 ), as follows: Plaintiff' claims for pain, suffering and punitive damages are extinguished; Plaintiff's claim for nominal damages survives for trial. IT IS FURTHER ORDER ED setting this matter for a telephonic status conference on June 1, 2016 at 2:30 p.m. before District Judge John J. Tuchi in Courtroom 505, 401 W. Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003. Counsel who will try the case shall have their calendars availab le and be prepared to discuss the trial schedule, length of trial, and any other issues related to trial of this matter. Chambers will e-mail dial-in information to all self-represented parties or counsel prior to the conference. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/13/2016.(KMG)
April 16, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery 65 is denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 4/15/14.(REW)
October 7, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint 25 is denied as moot; Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 28 is stricken. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/7/13.(REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miles v. Diaz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Wade Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terra Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Nowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?